Allen et al v. G.D. Searle LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04779
Filed: November 21, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles Breyer on 4/5/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
February 5, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Melissa Littrell terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 7, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Robert N. Beatty, Kenneth E. Bender, Harold D. Bigham, Sr, Lori Bishop, Raquel G. Blake, Thelma M. Bolen, James L. Carrier, Linda Castro, Albina M. Cellitti, Mona L. Collar, Timothy J. Crone, Linda J. Darbey, Dale H Deckerd, Tamela Fese, Joyce C Hansel, Donald E Hazelwood, Bertha L Henley, Wallace Howard, Shirley A Johnson, Alvin F Kanorr, Jr, Thomas A Kimmel, William D Koon, Jr, Michael J Kovinchick, Sharon A Kuninger, Aldine E Lapana, Donald Lisbon, John C Lombard, Julia A McClure, Mickey M McDerment, Barbara J. Atherton and Patricia K. Bainter terminated; Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
October 1, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Ethel L. Cook terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 30, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 58 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Paul R. Click. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
August 31, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: (3130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case M:05-cv-01699-CRB by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
April 20, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 56 Stipulation filed by Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc, G.D. Searle LLC, Sharon Allen terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 23, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO RICHARD M. BROWN. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009) Modified on 3/24/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2005 2 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2005 02:15 PM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/08/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. G.D. Searle LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?