Holloway et al v. Best Buy Co., Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv05056
Filed: December 8, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY LODGED UNDER SEAL IN THE PUBLIC RECORD re 338 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 8, 2010 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in part and Denying in part 333 Administrative Motion to Stay (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 7, 2010 336 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY BRIEF re 332 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/7/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 1, 2010 331 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PORTIONS OF DOCKET ITEM NO. 324 re 330 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 3, 2010 318 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING re 317 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 27, 2010 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 311 Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 6, 2010 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Shortening Time re Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/6/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
May 28, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING re 263 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Motions terminat ed: 150 MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Che ryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas, 156 MOTION to Certify Class and Notice of Motion filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas, 151 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Class Counsel filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 6, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 261 Class Certification Briefing (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 7, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 258 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/7/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 9, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Staying Ruling on 156 Class Certification Motion; Requesting Additional Briefing; Denying 150 167 178 200 204 225 238 Sealing Requests (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
July 6, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BY TWO WEEKS THE DEADLINE TO REPORT TO COURT RE: SPECIAL MASTER re 246 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
May 28, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 169 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO BRING IN EQUIPMENT re 218 Proposed Order, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/28/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 15, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/15/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
February 19, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONIC MEDIA re 162 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/19/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 3, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AS MODIFIED re 145 Stipulation, filed by Eric Blacksher, Maurice Calhoun, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel, Lawrence Santiago, Jr., Nicholas Dixon, Muembo Muanza, Jessica Treas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 8, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING 1) FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT 2) DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND 3) DISMISSAL OF CLASS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 142 Stipulation, filed by Nicholas Dixon, Maurice Calhoun, Muembo Muanza, Jasmen Holloway, Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 6, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING PARTIES TO EXCEED DISCOVERY LETTER PAGE LIMIT re 139 Stipulation filed by Jasmen Holloway. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 9, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CORPORATE OFFICER DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/9/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 1, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS re 134 Letter Brief filed by Nicholas Dixon, Maurice Calhoun, Muembo Muanza, Jasmen Holloway, Best Buy Co., Inc., Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 18, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 132 Letter Brief, filed by Nicholas Dixon, Maurice Calhoun, Muembo Muanza, Jasmen Holloway, Best Buy Co., Inc., Amy Garcia, Cheryl Chappel. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/18/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
September 9, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 130 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Co., Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/9/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway et al v. Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?