Garcia et al v. Fidelity Mortgage Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05144
Filed: December 13, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel adopting Report and Recommendations granting motion for default judgment and judgment thereon (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
January 6, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 86 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Courtney Garcia, Michael Garcia Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2010. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
September 3, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING & FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING re 95 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Evidentiary Hearing, Order Dismissing Case,,,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
May 27, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE re 95 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Evidentiary Hearing, Order Dismissing Case,,,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 5, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/4/2009:the court GRANTS plaintiff's motion for default judgment and REFERS the matter to Magistrate Judge Maria Elena James pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C) for the purpose of conducting an evidentiary hearing and submitting a report and recommendation on the amount of damages and costs to be awarded.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (CORRECTING DKT #84 TO CHANGE PLAINTIFFS' NAMES) re 84 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS re 83 Notice (Other) filed by Courtney Garcia, Michael Garcia. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINES re 81 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 6, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 80 Status Report filed by Courtney Garcia, Michael Garcia. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
November 17, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED STATUS REPORT BY 1/14/2009. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Fidelity Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?