Lynch Marks, LLC v. Vermonster, LLC Featured Case

Case Number: 3:2005cv05178
Filed: December 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2006 33 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/18/2006. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2006)
July 18, 2006 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 7/18/2006)
July 17, 2006 31 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TENTATIVE RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2006)
July 13, 2006 Mediator has scheduled the Pre MED phone conference on 7/17/2006 at 3:30 p.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
June 29, 2006 30 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing George C. Fisher as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 29, 2006 29 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator, Jack Russo. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 26, 2006 28 Request for Judicial Notice re 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Vermonster's Motion to Dismiss filed byLynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC. (Related document(s) 26 ) (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 26, 2006 27 Declaration in Support of 26 Memorandum in Opposition to Vermonster's Motion to Dismiss filed byLynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC. (Related document(s) 26 ) (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 26, 2006 26 MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in OPPOSITION to Defendant Vermonster, LLC's Motion to Dismiss re 23 Filed by Plaintiff & Counterclaim-Defendant Lynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC. (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 6/26/2006)...Modified on 7/6/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2006 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/19/2006. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 16, 2006 24 STIPULATION Changing Hearing Date by Vermonster, LLC, Vermonster, LLC. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
May 30, 2006 23 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Claims in the Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) & Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) Filed by Defendant Vermonster, LLC.. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2006 at 10:00 A.M in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 5/30/2006)...Modified on 6/1/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2006 22 AMENDED Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2006 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 5/10/2006). (Digital Recording: 4:52-5:07) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2006)
May 3, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 3, 2006 21 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/2/2006. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 2, 2006 20 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2006 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 5/2/2006). Jury Trial set for 2/5/2007 08:30 A.M. in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Digital Recording: 4:52-5:07) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2006)
May 1, 2006 19 Letter from Brad W. Blocker to Hon. Bernard Zimmerman. (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 24, 2006 [DUPLICATE PAYMENT]....FILING FEE RECEIVED re 14 : $210.00, Receipt Number 3384767. (tn, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2006 18 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 17 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 16 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 12, 2006 FILING FEE RECEIVED re 14 & re 15 : $420.00, Receipt Number 3384352. (tn, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2006 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Sean Roche filed by Vermonster, LLC, Vermonster, LLC. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 14 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hass filed by Vermonster, LLC, Vermonster, LLC. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 11, 2006 13 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Jack Russo as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 11, 2006 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement and Proposed Order filed by Lynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC. (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
March 30, 2006 Per 11 CASE REFERRED to Mediation to be completed within 90 days. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 30, 2006 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/28/2006. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 28, 2006 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 27, 2006 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Lynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC (Lucey, James) (Filed on 3/27/2006)
March 27, 2006 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 3/27/2006)
March 21, 2006 7 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Lynch Marks, LLC's Reply to Counterclaim byLynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC. (Blocker, Brad) (Filed on 3/21/2006)
March 7, 2006 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lynch Marks, LLC, Lynch Marks, LLC.. (Anderson, Jason) (Filed on 3/7/2006)
February 28, 2006 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vermonster, LLC, Vermonster, LLC. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
February 28, 2006 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vermonster, LLC.. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
February 27, 2006 3 Vermonster's ANSWER to Complaint of Lynch Marks, First COUNTERCLAIM against Lynch Marks, LLC byVermonster, LLC. (Nuetzel, Victoria) (Filed on 2/27/2006)
December 14, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2005 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 4/10/2006 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2006 at 4:00 P.M. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2005)
December 14, 2005 SUMMONS Issued as to Vermonster, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2005 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Specific Performance or Restitution in the alternative for Breach of Contract, Conversion, Fraud in the Inducement & Intentional Interference with Contract & Prospective Business Advantage & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Vermonster, LLC, [Filing Fee:$250.00, Receipt Number 3379414]. Filed by Plaintiff Lynch Marks, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch Marks, LLC v. Vermonster, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?