Perez et al v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05338
Filed: December 23, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY OF JUDGMENT AND APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND re 223 Stipulation filed by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/26/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
March 15, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 198 Motion for Attorney's Fees (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
August 10, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES re 202 Stipulation filed by Safety-Kleen Corp., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
January 14, 2009 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 180 Stipulation filed by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/14/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 6, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Further Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 3, 2008 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference (Re Attorney's Fees and Costs). Further Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
October 1, 2008 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/1/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?