Vitale et al v. G.D. Searle & Co. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05353
Filed: December 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/28/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
March 11, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRONEOUSLY POSTED PLEASE DISREGARD ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATED DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. MDL NO. 2017 S.D. OF N.Y. 09-1239. Signed by J. Frederick Motz Acting Chairman of the Panel on 2/9/09. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/11/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
January 9, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER #2 Status Conference set for 1/27/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/13/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitale et al v. G.D. Searle & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?