Securities and Exchange Commission v. McAfee Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv00009
Filed: January 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING THE PETITION FOR PAYMENT OF FINAL FEES AND COSTS AND APPROVING THE TRANSFER OF REMAINING MONIES IN TEH MCAFEE FAIR FUND TO THE COMMISSION re 129 Status Report, filed by Jeffrey Plotkin. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/31/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
April 6, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 111 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Distribution Agent's Application for Payment of Fees and Expenses filed by Jeffrey Plotkin. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
January 19, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Disbursement of Funds signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/19/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. McAfee Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?