Nichia Corporation v. Seoul Semiconductor Ltd et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00162
Filed: January 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2008 986 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The jury having found defendants willfully infringed United States Design Patent No. 491,538, United States Design Patent No. 490,784, United States Design Patent No. 503,388, and United States Design Patent No. 499,385, and having found each such patent valid, judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendants in the amount of $250., ***Civil Case Terminated. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 984 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. The Court finds the matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument and vacates the February 8, 2008 hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 982 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NICHIA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION OF ITS RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO THE SEOUL DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF BRUCE MCFARLANE IN SUPPORT OF SEOUL'S SUR-REPLY UNDER SEAL. Defendants are relieved of any obligation to file in the public record the portions referenced in the Court's January 31, 2008 order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichia Corporation v. Seoul Semiconductor Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?