Schaffer v. County of Alameda et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00310
Filed: January 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ROBERT ANDERSON'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Anderson's request for issuance of a certificate of appealability is denied as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ROBERT ANDERSON'S MOTION TO APPROVE LATE CLAIM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
January 30, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ROBERT ANDERSON'S LETTER FILED JANUARY 9, 2009. Class counsel is directed to file a response to Anderson's motion, and to serve a copy thereof on Anderson, no later than February 20, 2009. If Anderson wishes to file a reply to class counsel's response, any such reply shall be filed and served on class counsel no later than March 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
December 8, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLASS COUNSEL TO FILE RESPONSE TO JANICE L. FREEMANS LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 24, 2008. Class counsel is directed to file, no later than December 30, 2008, a response to Freeman's letter and to serve a copy thereof on Freeman. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 7, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLASS COUNSEL TO FILE RESPONSE TO CLASS MEMBER PAGE'S EX PARTE MOTION. The Court directs class counsel to file, no later than November 21, 2008, a response to Page's motion, and to serve a copy thereof on Page. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaffer v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?