Internet Archive v. Shell Featured Case

Plaintiff: Internet Archive
Defendant: Brewster Kahle, Rick Prelinger, Kathleen Burch and Suzanne Shell
Counter-defendant: Internet Archive
Counter-claimant: Suzanne Shell
3rd Party Defendant: Internet Archive
Case Number: 3:2006cv00397
Filed: January 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2006 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REGARDING OUTSTANDING MOTIONS; VACATING HEARING DATE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/17/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2006)
March 21, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2006 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2006.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/21/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2006)
March 14, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/14/06. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006)
January 20, 2006 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Non-Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Archive v. Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewster Kahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Prelinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Archive
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Internet Archive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Suzanne Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Internet Archive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?