Snyder et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Number: 3:2006cv00497
Filed: January 25, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING THAT LODGED DOCUMENTS BE FILED PER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 1-5(M); VACATING HEARING. Granting 201 , Ford Motor Company shall file in the public record copies of the lodged exhibits no later than March 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
October 7, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: COSTS. By stipulation of the parties, costs awarded to defendant Ford Motor Company in this action shall be $6,675. Enforcement of the bill of costs shall be stayed without the need for a bond until the later of (1) if an appeal is f iled in this action, thirty days after a remittitur is issued on the appeal, or (2) if no appeal is filed in this action, thirty days after the deadline to appeal has expired. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/7/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
September 15, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Ford Motor Company against Rebecca Klein, Richard Smith. 1. Fords Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff Richard Smith is hereby GRANTED.2. Fords Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff Rebecca Klein is hereby GRANTED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 13, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 132 , 133 DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
October 2, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 176 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN M. THOMAS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 30, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 2, 2009 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
August 11, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
June 30, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING FILING AND HEARING DATES REGARDING FORD'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed no later than July 6, 2009, defendant's reply shall be filed no later than August 10, 2009, and the hearing will be on September 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
May 13, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONTINUING DATES RE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed no later than June 30, 2009. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than August 4, 2009. The hearing on the motion is continued to August 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
February 18, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING SCHEDULE REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than May 26, 2009, defendant's reply shall be filed no later than June 23, 2009, and the hearing on the motion shall be on July 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
November 18, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Bradley W. Petersen is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 13, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 129 Stipulation filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/13/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 30, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REVISE SCHEDULE REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than November 17, 2008. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion, if any, no later than February 23, 2009. Defendan t shall file its reply no later than March 23, 2009. The hearing on defendant's motion shall be on April 10, 2009. In the event plaintiffs file a cross-motion for summary judgment, the parties shall, no later than five days thereafter, submit a stipulated revised briefing schedule, in which the proposed hearing date on both motions is no earlier than three weeks after plaintiffs' reply is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?