Hepting et al v. AT&T Corp. et al Featured Case

The Electronic Frontier Foundation is suing AT&T, alleging that the company illegally helped the government spy on its internet and phone customers. This is the lead suit in a consolidated action against the nation\'s telecoms.

Case Number: 3:2006cv00672
Filed: January 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 395 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
December 15, 2009 394 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 11, 2009 393 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 391 Notice of Appeal (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
August 20, 2009 392 USCA Case Number 06-16676 USCA for 391 Notice of Appeal. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
July 31, 2009 391 NOTICE OF APPEAL. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 2nd part of Notice of Appeal)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 21, 2009 390 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's June 3, 2009 Order, judgment is hereby entered in favor of all defendants. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
December 2, 2008 389 Minute Entry: Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment held on 12/2/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The court heard argument from counsel.The matter has been submitted.The court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2008)
November 24, 2008 388 CLERKS NOTICE : TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD;YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court has set the following schedule:December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (including Hepting v AT&T (06-0672 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 2:00 P.M. Al-Haramain et al v George Bush (07-0109 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f). Please report to Courtroom No.6, on the 17th floor at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 6, 2008 387 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 28, 2008 386 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 383 Motion to Relate Case. C06-0672 and C08-4373 are related. LR 3-12. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 23, 2008 385 Response re 384 Proposed Order, 383 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service Response of AT&T Corp. to Hepting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate Jewel to Hepting [Docket Nos. 383-84] byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 21, 2008 384 Proposed Order re 383 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service ; Deeming Cases Related and Assigning Jewel to MDL Docket No. 06-1791 VRW, In Re National Security Agency Telecommunications Records Litigation by All Plaintiffs. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 383 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 30, 2008 382 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF HELLER EHRMAN LLP AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS TASH HEPTING et al re 379 . Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/30/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 381 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re (468 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW): SCHEDULE: Al-Haramain v Bush (07-0109 VRW): 9/30/08 - Govt Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (30 pages)9/30/08 - Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f) (30 pages)10/23/08 - Govt Defendants' Opposition (30 pages)10/23/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (30 pages)11/14/08 - Govt Defendants' and Plaintiffs' Reply Briefs (15 pages)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. SCHEDULE: MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (MDL06-1791 ) (including Hepting v ATT (06-0672 VRW): 9/19/08 - Govt's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment(filed 9/9/08) (25 pages)10/16/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (50 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Govt's Reply (35 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Brief of Telecom Carrier Defendants (30 pages)11/20/08 - Plaintiffs' Reply to Telecom Carriers (35 pages per stipulation)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 380 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEF LENGTH re (471 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) filed by All Plaintiffs. Based upon the stipulation, the following shall be the page limits for the remaining briefs: Plaintiffs' Opposition: 50 pages. Government Reply: 35 pages. Carrier Brief: 30 pages. Plaintiffs' response to Carrier brief: 35 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/30/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 29, 2008 379 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Withdrawal of Heller Ehrman LLP as Counsel for Plaintiffs Tash Hepting, et al. by Tash Hepting. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 18, 2008 376 Appeal Record Returned: (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 17, 2008 378 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 377 USCA ORDER as to 341 Notice of Appeal filed by AT&T Corp. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 12, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 375 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. SCHEDULE:Al-Haramain and Telecomm Cases:Defs file motion to dismiss or for summary judgment - 9/30/08. Plas file motion for discovery under 1806 (f) - 9/30/08. Plas file opposition to defs motion to dismiss/sj - 10/23/08. Defs file opposition to plas motion for discovery (1806(f)) - 10/23/08. File reply memorandum - 11/14/08. Hearing: 12/2/2008 at 10:00 A.M. Page limits:Government - 25,30,30 = total 85 pages.Plaintiffs - 40, 45 = total 85 pages. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2008)
August 22, 2008 374 NOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 11:00 AM. in Hepting et al v AT&T Corp et al. and pending Carrier cases. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
March 25, 2008 373 Featured Case REVISED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER re (370 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order filed September 10, 2007 signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
February 7, 2008 372 Minute Entry: Case Management and Status Conference held on 2/7/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. RESULTS:Further briefing re 1806(f) in Al-Haramain case only.Amici were permitted to file their briefs.Schedule: File brief : 3/14/08. Opposition: 3/28/08. Reply: 4/14/08. Hearing: 4/23/2008 at 10:00 AM.Filing of the briefs limited to the master MDL case and the individual case only.Page limitation has been set by the court to up to 40page limit. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2008)
February 5, 2008 371 NOTICE by United States of America of Withdrawal of Counsel (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
January 25, 2008 370 CLERK'S NOTICE : Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2008 10:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
December 14, 2007 369 NOTICE by AT&T Corp. PROOF OF SERVICE BY E-MAIL (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 368 NOTICE by AT&T Corp. Notice of Manual Filing (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 367 NOTICE by United States of America of Manual Filing (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
November 1, 2007 366 RESPONSE in Support re 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
October 26, 2007 365 Joinder of AT&T, Cingular and Bellsouth Defendants and United States' 363 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Preserve Evidence (Dkt. 386) by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 10/26/2007) Modified on 10/29/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2007 364 NOTICE by United States of America re 363 Memorandum in Opposition,, of Lodging of Classified Supplement & accompanying Declaration (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 25, 2007 363 Memorandum in Opposition re 362 MOTION to Amend/Correct 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence, 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Coppolino Declaration & Exhibits Thereto)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 3, 2007 362 MOTION to Amend/Correct 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 1, 2007 361 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. Pursuant to stipulation and good cause appearing, the Court hereby orders the following documents will be unsealed: Declaration of Mark Klein (dkt no. 230); Declaration of Mark Klein's exh A pp 1,4, exh B pp 6,20 and exh C pp 1,3,45-6; Declaration of J Scott Marcus (dkt no. 231); Declaration of J Scott Marcus' exh L-P and exh U. Plaintiffs may file public versions, or in some cases public redacted versions, of the documents identified in para 1 and attached as exhibits 1-4 to the stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/1/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 26, 2007 360 Featured Case ORDER by Judge VRW finding as moot 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; terminating 33 Motion to Seal ; terminating 38 Motion to Seal; terminating 48 Motion to Seal; terminating 79 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 219 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 229 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 25, 2007 359 Proposed Order re 358 Stipulation by All Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 25, 2007 358 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 20, 2007 357 Proposed Order [Proposed] Interim Order to Preserve Evidence by Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 20, 2007 356 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of Plaintiffs' 355 Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byTash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Modified on 9/26/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 355 MOTION Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by Tash Hepting. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
July 18, 2007 354 Receipt for Appeal Record re appeal 353 Appeal Record Sent to USCA, : (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 12, 2007 353 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) Modified on 7/19/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2007 352 Appendix re (6 in 3:07-cv-00464-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01187-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06254-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05576-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-07934-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02029-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06434-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05269-VRW, 67 in 3:06-cv-03596-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06570-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06224-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06294-VRW, 70 in 3:06-cv-03574-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05268-VRW, 12 in 3:06-cv-06387-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01323-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05066-VRW, 13 in 3:06-cv-06222-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06435-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05063-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06253-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-01396-VRW, 7 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06295-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-06313-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05065-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05067-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-05452-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05340-VRW, 319 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05064-VRW, 32 in 3:06-cv-03467-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01326-VRW, 9 in 3:07-cv-00109-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-06225-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01242-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06388-VRW, 13 in 3:07-cv-01324-VRW, 351 in 3:06-cv-00672-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05267-VRW, 5 in 3:06-cv-06385-VRW, 6 in 3:06-cv-05341-VRW, 5 in 3:07-cv-01243-VRW, 8 in 3:06-cv-05485-VRW, 7 in 3:06-cv-05343-VRW, 4 in 3:06-cv-06924-VRW, 4 in 3:07-cv-02538-VRW, 14 in 3:06-cv-04221-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition, to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Master Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tabs 4-12# 2 Exhibit Tabs 13-20)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 23, 2007 351 Memorandum in Opposition re (273 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 22, 2007 350 Declaration of Candace J. Morey in Support of (315 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by the United States filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Z# 2 Exhibit AA-II# 3 Exhibit JJ-KK)(Morey, Candace) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 349 Memorandum in Opposition re (253 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on State Secrets Grounds filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
April 30, 2007 348 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 342 Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America,, 341 Notice of Appeal filed by AT&T Corp. The court has reviewed the motion for reconsideration and responses thereto, includng the opposition to consolidation filed by the non-party plaintiff's appellees in Hepting v. AT&T. appeals No, 06-17132. 06-17137. The motion for reconsideration seeking to lift the stay of appellate proceedings is granted. Appellants' April 20, 2007 motion for leave to file an opposition to appellees' proposed briefing scheduled in appeal No. 06-36083 is granted. Appellants' opposition has been filed. The Clerk shall consolidate and calendar this appeal with the appeals Hepting v. AT&T Corp. appeal No. 06-17132, and Hepting v. United States appeal No. 06-17137. The briefing schedule in appeal Nos. 06-17132 and 06-17137 remains as previously established. The following briefing schedule shall be set for appeal No. 06-36083; the opening brief and excerpts or record are due June 6, 2007, the answering brief is due July 6, 2007; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) shall not be applicable to appeal No. 06-36083; any Rule 31-2.2(b) request is strongly disfavored. The Clerk shall calendar these consolidated appeals during the week of August 13-17. 2007, in San Francisco, California. No motions for reconsideration, modification or clarification of this order shall be filed or entertained. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
February 20, 2007 347 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 324 motion to stay. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
February 20, 2007 346 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Walker granting in part and denying in part 133 motion to intervene, granting in part and denying in part 139 motion to Intervene. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2007)
December 22, 2006 345 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 342 Notice of Appeal, 341 Notice of Appeal: (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 7, 2006 344 NOTICE by United States of America Regarding Transcript Orders (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 12/7/2006)
November 17, 2006 343 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., for proceedings held on 5/17/2006, 6/23/2006, 8/8/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 15, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-17132 for 341 Notice of Appeal filed by AT&T Corp.,. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 15, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-17137 for 342 Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America,. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 15, 2006 342 NOTICE OF APPEAL/ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) by United States of America. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 13, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 341 Notice of Appeal (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 13, 2006 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2006)
November 9, 2006 341 NOTICE OF APPEAL/ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) by AT&T Corp.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 3392285. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2006) Modified on 11/13/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2006 340 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/8/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 14, 2006 338 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER that CondeNet Inc. shall be substituted for Lycos, Inc for all purposes in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/14/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 14, 2006 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 335 Letter from Bruce A. Ericson to Judge Vaughn Walker (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 14, 2006 336 Featured Case ORDER to stay all further proceedings until September 29, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 8/14/2006. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006)
August 11, 2006 335 Letter from Bruce A. Ericson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
August 10, 2006 334 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (Amended) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/10/2006)
August 10, 2006 333 Letter from Cindy A. Cohn. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/10/2006)
August 8, 2006 339 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference and hearing on Defendant AT&T and USA's motion to stay pending appeal held on 8/8/2006. The court determined that it would not, at this stage, appoint a technical advisor or expert witness and that it would issue a stay of limited duration. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2006)
August 7, 2006 332 NOTICE by CondeNet Inc., Wired News NOTICE OF MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION AND REQUEST TO BE HEARD AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 8/7/2006)
August 4, 2006 331 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF PROPOSED INTERVENOR by CondeNet Inc., Wired News. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
August 2, 2006 330 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker GRANTING 310 motion for interim stay. All further proceedings are stayed until further order of the court. AT&T's and the government's motions for a stay of proceedings pending appeal will be heard on August 8, 2006, at 2:00 pm. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2006)
August 1, 2006 329 Memorandum in Opposition to AT&T Admin Motion for Interim Stay filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
August 1, 2006 328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 326 Response to Order to Show Cause, 325 Proposed Order, 324 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 8/1/2006)
July 31, 2006 327 Plaintiff's Demontrative Presentation Presented at the June 23, 2006 Hearing by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 326 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 325 Proposed Order re 324 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL by AT&T Corp.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 324 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by AT&T Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 323 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 268 Motion of CNET News.com and California First Amendment Coalition for leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 322 Featured Case ORDER re 232 Amicus Curiae Appearance, filed by Susan Freiwald,, Amici Law Professors, (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 321 Featured Case ORDER re 297 granting MOTION for Leave to File Supplementary Material filed by Tash Hepting,, Gregory Hicks,, Erik Knutzen,, Carolyn Jewel, (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 320 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 297 Plaintiffs' Motion to File documents under seal. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 319 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 233 Motion of The Center for National Security Studies for Leave to File as amicus curiea. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 318 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 172 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to extend page limit. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 317 RESPONSE in Support PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED IN THE COURT'S JULY 20, 2006 ORDER filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 316 NOTICE by United States of America re 315 Response to Order to Show Cause United States' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Material with Response to Order to Show Cause (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 31, 2006 315 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 28, 2006 314 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 311 Declaration in Support, 310 MOTION to Stay PENDING DETERMINATION OF AT&T CORP.'S MOTION TO STAY, 312 Proposed Order Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 7/28/2006)
July 27, 2006 313 Letter from Daniel N. Gall dated 7/20/2006 to the Honorable Vaughn R. Walker regarding expert appointment for this case.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2006)
July 27, 2006 312 Proposed Order re 310 MOTION to Stay PENDING DETERMINATION OF AT&T CORP.'S MOTION TO STAY by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/27/2006)
July 27, 2006 311 Declaration of Jacob R. Sorensen in Support of 310 MOTION to Stay PENDING DETERMINATION OF AT&T CORP.'S MOTION TO STAY filed byAT&T Corp.. (Related document(s) 310 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/27/2006)
July 27, 2006 310 MOTION to Stay PENDING DETERMINATION OF AT&T CORP.'S MOTION TO STAY filed by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/27/2006)
July 24, 2006 309 Featured Case ORDER The court has reviewed a July 20, 2006, letter sent from a Daniel Gall. The clerk is DIRECTED to file this letter and to serve the letter on the parties.Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/24/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
July 20, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2006 02:00 PM. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
July 20, 2006 308 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 86 Motion to Dismiss, denying 124 Motion to Dismiss. The court DENIES the government's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment on the basis of state secrets and DENIES AT&T's motion to dismiss. The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by July 31, 2006, why the court should not appoint an expert pursuant to FRE 706 to assist the court. The parties' briefs should also address whether this action should be stayed pending an appeal pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b). The parties are also instructed to appear on August 8, 2006, at 2 PM, for a further case management conference.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006).
July 17, 2006 307 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 303 Motion to Relate Case (C06-4221). (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2006)
July 14, 2006 306 Memorandum in Opposition HEPTING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 11, 2006 304 Memorandum in Opposition United States' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Supplementary Material filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Orleans, Renee) (Filed on 7/11/2006)
July 11, 2006 303 MOTION to Related Case filed by Tash Hepting. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 7/11/2006)
July 11, 2006 302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE VIA HAND DELIVERY OF LETTER OF BRUCE A. ERICSON IN RESPONSE TO LETTER OF JASON SCHULTZ DATED JUNE 22, 2006 (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/11/2006)
July 11, 2006 301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 290 Notice (Other) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/11/2006)
July 7, 2006 300 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's True and Correct Copy Declaration made on 6/19/2006 filed byWillie H. Ellis. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2006)
July 6, 2006 299 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To file Supplementary Material by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
July 6, 2006 298 Declaration of Elena M. DiMuzio In Support of Motion To File Supplementary Material filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
July 6, 2006 297 MOTION for Leave to File Supplementary Material filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
July 5, 2006 296 Letter from Joseph M. Gaffney to Chief Judge Walker dated 6/25/2006 concerning the federal government's intrusion into this case.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2006)
July 5, 2006 295 Letter from James B. Fatchett dated 4/13/2006 concerning knowledge of domestic listening activities conducted by the National Security Agency.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2006)
July 5, 2006 294 EXHIBITS A-K, Q-T, and V-Y to Declaration of J. Scott Marcus in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits Q-R# 2 Exhibit Exhibit S, Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit S, Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit S, Part 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibits T, V-Y)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/5/2006)
July 4, 2006 293 Featured Case ORDER The court has reviewed an April 13, 2006, letter sent from a James B Fatchett and a June 25, 2006, letter sent from a Joseph M Gaffney. The clerk is DIRECTED to file these letters and to serve the letters on the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/4/2006.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/4/2006)
July 3, 2006 292 Declaration of Jacob R. Sorensen in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Their Demonstrative Presentation From the June 23, 2006 Hearing Under Seal filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/3/2006)
July 3, 2006 291 RESPONSE in Support Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Their Demonstrative Presentation From the June 23, 2006 Hearing Under Seal filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/3/2006)
June 30, 2006 290 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 278 Letter NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF LETTER OF BRUCE A. ERICSON IN RESPONSE TO LETTER OF JASON SCHULTZ DATED JUNE 22, 2006 [DKT. 278] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/30/2006)
June 28, 2006 289 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Manual Filing (Demonstrative Presentation Presented at The June 23, 2006 Hearing) (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 28, 2006 288 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To File Documents Under Seal by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 28, 2006 287 Declaration of Elena M. DiMuzio in support of Administrative Motion To Lodge Documents With The Court (N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rules 7-11, 79-5) filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 28, 2006 286 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Motion and Motion To File The Demonstrative Presentation Presented at The June 23, 2006 Hearing Under Seal (DiMuzio, Elena) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 28, 2006 285 Response to Question 8 (Summary) byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/28/2006)
June 27, 2006 284 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/23/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 27, 2006 283 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 256 Application for Admission of Attorney Susan A. Freiwald Pro Hac Vice. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006)
June 26, 2006 282 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 122 the government's motion to intervene. At the June 23, 2006, hearing, the court granted the government's unopposed motion to intervene (Doc #122). The remaining motions addressed by the parties at the hearing remain under submission. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 23, 2006 281 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 124 89 86 79 133 139 ; motion to intervene by the United States ; motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment based on the government's assertion of the state secrets doctrine; motion to dismiss by AT&T Corp for failing to plead the absence of immunity and for lack of standing; motion to dismiss by AT&T Inc for lack of personal jurisdiction; motion to intervene and to unseal documents by various media entities; motion to intervene and to unseal documents by Lycos, Inc and Wired News. The Court granted the govt's unopposed motion to intervene. The Court also heard arguments from counsel on the other motions and took those matters under submission. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2006)
June 23, 2006 280 Declaration of James S. Tyre in Support of 174 Memorandum in Opposition SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JAMES S. TYRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO AT&T INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 22, 2006 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel re 278 Letter (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 278 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Vaughn R. Walker dated 6/22/2006. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006) Modified on 6/22/2006 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2006 277 Declaration of J. Scott Marcus [REDACTED] in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part 2# 2 Supplement Part 3# 3 Supplement Part 4# 4 Supplement Part 5# 5 Supplement Part 6# 6 Supplement Part 7)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 276 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Manual Filing of Letter to Hon. Vaughn R. Walker and Proof of Service (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 22, 2006 275 Featured Case ORDER Granting request to bring audio-visual equipment to hearing on 6/23/2006, re 260 Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/22/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 21, 2006 274 Proposed Order re 268 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by California First Amendment Coalition, CNET News.com. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 21, 2006 273 Declaration of Roger Myers in Support of 270 Brief [Amici Curiae] in Support of Motion of Lycos and Wired News to Intervene and Unseal Documents filed byCalifornia First Amendment Coalition, CNET News.com. (Related document(s) 270 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 21, 2006 270 Brief re 139 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Documents Amici Curiae Brief in Support of filed byCalifornia First Amendment Coalition, CNET News.com. (Related document(s) 139 ) (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 21, 2006 268 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by California First Amendment Coalition, CNET News.com. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2006)
June 20, 2006 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Schneider re Proposed Order, 269 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief, 271 Declaration in Support, (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 Proposed Order re 269 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Eric Schneider. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 271 Declaration of Eric Schneider in Support of 133 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene; Notice of Motion and Motion to Unseal Documents filed byEric Schneider. (Related document(s) 133 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 269 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Eric Schneider. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 267 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 208 Motion to Relate Cases C06-0672 and C06-3596. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 266 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 247 unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by the United States of America. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 264 Memorandum in Opposition [REDACTED] to Motion to Dismiss, etc. by the United States Based on State Secrets Privilege filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Redacted Brief Part 2# 2 Supplement Redacted Brief Part 3# 3 Supplement Redacted Brief Part 4)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 263 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation, AT&T may file a reply to docket 176 of not more than 18 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/20/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 262 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition [REDACTED] of Michael Markman to Motion to Dismiss, etc. by the United States Based on State Secrets Privilege filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 261 Featured Case ORDERIn addition to all other matters pertinent to the hearing noticed for June 23, 2006, the parties should be prepared to address the questions provided in this order.Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 06/20/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 260 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel Request For Permission To Bring Audio/Visual Equipment To Hearing On June 23, 2006; [Proposed] Order (Markman, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 252 Memorandum in Opposition VIA U.S. MAIL (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 252 Memorandum in Opposition VIA OVERNIGHT COURIER (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 20, 2006 257 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 252 Memorandum in Opposition VIA HAND DELIVERY (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/20/2006)
June 19, 2006 255 Proposed Order re 253 Memorandum in Opposition, 254 Declaration in Support [PROPOSED] ORDER DESIGNATING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 23(g) by Benson B. Roe. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 254 Declaration of BARRY HIMMELSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF ROE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL filed byBenson B. Roe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 253 Memorandum in Opposition ROE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL filed byBenson B. Roe. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 252 Memorandum in Opposition of AT&T Corp. to Electronic Frontier Foundation's Administrative Motion for Designation of Interim Class Counsel filed byAT&T Corp.. (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 251 Proposed Order re 249 Memorandum in Opposition, [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE AND CONSOLIDATE SIMILAR AND PENDING CASE NUMBER A-05-CA-682-LY IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 250 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Support of 249 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF SHANA E. SCARLETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION INTERVENE AND CONSOLIDATE SIMILAR AND PENDING CASE NUMBER A-05-CA-682-LY IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C PART 1# 4 Exhibit C PART 2# 5 Exhibit C PART 3# 6 Exhibit C PART 4)(Related document(s) 249 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 249 Memorandum in Opposition re 207 MOTION to Intervene PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE AND CONSOLIDATE SIMILAR AND PENDING CASE NUMBER A-05-CA-682-LY IN THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 19, 2006 248 Reply to Opposition re 139 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Documents filed byLycos, Inc., Wired News. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 6/19/2006)
June 16, 2006 247 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by United States of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 246 NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Material (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 245 Reply Memorandum re 124 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and in Support of the Assertion of the Military and State Secrets Privilege filed byUnited States of America. (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 244 Reply to Opposition Reply Memorandum of Defendant AT&T Corp. in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 243 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Granting AT&T Corp. Leave to File Excess Pages by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Inc. re 240 Declaration in Support,, 239 Request for Judicial Notice,, 241 Declaration in Support,, 238 Reply Memorandum (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 241 Declaration of Joseph P. Tocco in Support of 238 Reply Memorandum, 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum filed byAT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 238 , 79 ) (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 240 Declaration of Starlene Meyerkord in Support of 238 Reply Memorandum, 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum filed byAT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 238 , 79 ) (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 239 Request for Judicial Notice re 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum, 238 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byAT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 79 , 238 ) (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 238 Reply Memorandum re 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum filed byAT&T Inc.. (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tom Campbell re 234 Memorandum in Opposition, to AT&T Corp's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Proposed Order (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 236 Brief of Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Motion by the United States Government to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byThe Center for National Security Studies. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 235 Proposed Order re 234 Memorandum in Opposition, Denying Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Tom Campbell. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 234 Memorandum in Opposition re 208 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Nos. C-06-0672-VRW and C-06-3596-VRW) by Plaintiffs Tom Campbell, et al. and Dennis P. Riordan, et al. filed byTom Campbell. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 233 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by The Center for National Security Studies. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gross, Terry) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 232 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jennifer Stisa Granick on behalf of Amici Law Professors, Susan Freiwald. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Participation# 2 Freiwald et. al. Law Professors Amici Brief)(Granick, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 15, 2006 Proposed Order re 256 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Susan Freiwald. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 15, 2006 256 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Susan Freiwald filed by Susan Freiwald. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 15, 2006 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/15/2006)
June 14, 2006 216 NOTICE by AT&T Corp. re 208 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Nos. C-06-0672-VRW and C-06-3596-VRW) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT IN CONNECTION WITH ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 215 Proposed Order re 213 Notice (Other) [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 1 by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 214 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 213 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF CINDY A. COHN IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 213 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 213 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 212 Featured Case ORDER granting request to file under seal Plaintiffs' Statement in support of motion by Lycos, Inc and Wired News for orders permitting intervention and unsealing documents re 197 Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/14/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 211 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 183 Motion to Seal Document, granting 183 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The court hereby Orders that Plaintiffs may file a memorandum of points and authorities of 60 pages in support of their opposition to the United States' motion to dismiss, and may file this motion and the supporting declaration under seal. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 14, 2006 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 208 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Nos. C-06-0672-VRW and C-06-3596-VRW) Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/14/2006)
June 13, 2006 209 MOTION to Related Case Proposed Order Deeming Cases Related filed by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 208 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Nos. C-06-0672-VRW and C-06-3596-VRW) filed by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. TO RESPONSE OF AT&T CORP. TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DKTS. 183-85] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 205 RESPONSE in Support RESPONSE OF AT&T CORP. TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DKTS. 183-85] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today re 202 Memorandum in Opposition, (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 203 Proposed Order re 202 Memorandum in Opposition, DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION UNDER SEAL by Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 202 Memorandum in Opposition PRESS INTERVENORS' OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION UNDER SEAL (Rule 7-11(b)) filed byAssociated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 12, 2006 218 Statement in Support re 212 Order, filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 212 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 195 Memorandum in Opposition, 196 Declaration in Support,, Opposition of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Motion of Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders Permitting Intervention and Unsealing Documents [DKT. 139] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 200 Declaration of Maria V. Morris in Support of 199 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Motion by Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders (1) Permitting Intervention and (2) Unsealing Documents filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 199 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Manual Filing Regarding Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Motion by Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders (1) Permitting Intervention and (2) Unsealing Documents (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 198 Proposed Order Regarding Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 to Seal Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Motion by Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders (1) Permitting Intervention and (2) Unsealing Documents by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 197 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Motion and Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 to Seal Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Motion by Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders (1) Permitting Intervention and (2) Unsealing Documents (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 196 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 195 Memorandum in Opposition of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Motion of Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders Permitting Intervention and Unsealing Documents [DKT. 139] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I, Part One# 10 Exhibit I, Part Two# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 195 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 195 Memorandum in Opposition of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Motion of Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders Permitting Intervention and Unsealing Documents [DKT. 139] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 10, 2006 190 RESPONSE in Support Response of AT&T Corp. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [Dkts. 172-73, 175] filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/10/2006)
June 9, 2006 189 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 165 Motion to Relate Case. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 9, 2006 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today re 186 Reply Memorandum,, 187 Declaration in Support, (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 9, 2006 187 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 186 Reply Memorandum, in Support of Press' Motion to Intervene and Unseal Records filed byAssociated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 186 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 9, 2006 186 Reply Memorandum re 133 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene; Notice of Motion and Motion to Unseal Documents filed byAssociated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 8, 2006 194 DECLARATION of Michael M. Markman in Opposition to 124 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 124 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 193 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 192 Memorandum in Opposition re 124 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 191 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 185 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Page Limit and File Documents Under Seal by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 184 Declaration of Michael M. Markman in support of administrative motions to extend page limit for opposition to United States' motion to dismiss and to lodge documents with the Court (N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rules 7-11, 79-5) filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 183 MOTION to Seal Document opposition to motion to dismiss, and declaration in support of motion to dismiss, First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 182 DECLARATION of Michael M. Markman in opposition to motion to dismiss (notice of manual filing - decl. only) filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Fram, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 181 Memorandum in Opposition to motion to dismiss (notice of manual filing) filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 6, 2006 207 MOTION to Intervene and Consolidate similar and pending case number A-05-CA-682-LY in the Western District of Texas at Austin filed by Willie H. Ellis. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 180 Declaration of Adam L. Rubinger in Support of 174 Memorandum in Opposition [CORRECTED] Declaration of Adam L. Rubinger in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 179 Declaration of James S. Tyre in Support of 174 Memorandum in Opposition [CORRECTED] Declaration of James S. Tyre in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X# 25 Exhibit Y# 26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 178 Declaration of Daniel O'Brien in Support of 174 Memorandum in Opposition [CORRECTED] Declaration of Daniel O'Brien in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1# 2 Exhibit A2# 3 Exhibit A3# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 177 Proposed Order Denying AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 176 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant AT&T, Corp. filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 175 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Page Limit by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 174 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 173 Declaration of Michael M. Markman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Page Limit for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant AT&T, Corp. filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 172 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant AT&T, Corp.; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 171 Featured Case ORDER re 145 Response in Support filed by United States of America, 134 Memorandum in Support filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, 150 Reply Memorandum filed by AT&T Corp,Because review of the classified documents is necessary to determine whether and to what extent the state secrets privilege applies, the court ORDERS the government forthwith to provide in camera and no later than June 9, 2006, the classified memorandum and classified declarations of John D Negroponte and Keith B Alexander for review by the undersigned and by any chambers personnel that he so authorizes.Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 06/06/06. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2006).
June 6, 2006 170 Proposed Order DENYING AT&T INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 169 Declaration of JAMES S. TYRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO AT&T INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X# 25 Exhibit Y# 26 Exhibit Z)(Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 168 Declaration of DANIEL O'BRIEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AT&T INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 167 Declaration of ADAM L. RUBINGER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AT&T INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morris, Maria) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 5, 2006 165 MOTION to Related Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Benson B. Roe. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
June 2, 2006 162 DECLARATION of Bruce A. Ericson in Opposition to 160 Memorandum in Opposition DECLARATION OF BRUCE A. ERICSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS filed byAT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 161 RESPONSE in Support of Motions of the San Francisco Chronicle et al. for Leave to Intervene and to Unseal Records filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Tien, Tze) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 160 Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 159 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 154 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document,doc. #141. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 158 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 140 Lycos Inc and Wired News' Administrative Motion for an Order Shortening Time for hearing on their motion to intervene and motion to unseal documents. Hearing on the Motion by Lycos, Inc and Wired News to Intervene and Unseal Documents will be held on 6/23/2006 at 9:30 AM. Opposition due 6/12/2006. Reply due 6/19/2006. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
May 26, 2006 156 Proposed Order re 154 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re 141 Reply Memorandum, by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 155 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 154 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re 141 Reply Memorandum, filed byAT&T Corp.. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 154 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re 141 Reply Memorandum, filed by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 151 Memorandum in Opposition,, 152 Declaration in Support, (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 152 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 151 Memorandum in Opposition, AT&T's Opposition to Motion for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion of Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders Permitting Intervention and Unsealing Documents filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 151 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 151 Memorandum in Opposition AT&T's Opposition to Motion for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion of Lycos, Inc. and Wired News for Orders Permitting Intervention and Unsealing Documents filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 150 Reply Memorandum [Redacted] Reply Memorandum of Defendant AT&T Corp. in Response to Court's May 17, 2006 Minute Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 141 filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 25, 2006 149 MEMORANDUM in Support Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction [REDACTED] filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Document Part 2# 2 Supplement Document Part 3# 3 Supplement Document Part 4)(Tien, Tze) (Filed on 5/25/2006)
May 25, 2006 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (Tien, Tze) (Filed on 5/25/2006)
May 25, 2006 147 Declaration of Mark Klein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [REDACTED] filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Tien, Tze) (Filed on 5/25/2006)
May 25, 2006 146 Letter from Electronic Frontier Foundation to Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. (Tien, Tze) (Filed on 5/25/2006)
May 24, 2006 164 Reply Memorandum of defedant AT&T Corp. in Response to Court's May 17, 2006 Minute Order to re 130 Motion Hearing by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 163 MEMORANDUM in Response to Court's 5/17/2006 Minute Order re 130 Motion Hearing filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 130 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 150 Reply Memorandum (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 145 RESPONSE in Support United States' Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Court's May 17, 2006 Minute Order filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- El Masri Opinion (E.D.Va.))(Orleans, Renee) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News, USA Today re 133 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene; Notice of Motion and Motion to Unseal Documents (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 141 Reply Memorandum, 142 Notice (Other) Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 142 NOTICE by AT&T Corp. Notice of Manual Filing of Reply Memorandum of Defendant AT&T Corp. in Response to Court's May 17, 2006 Minute Order (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 24, 2006 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 150 . *** Reply Memorandum [Redacted] Reply Memorandum of Defendant AT&T Corp. in Response to Court's May 17, 2006 Minute Order filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/24/2006) Modified on 5/26/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/26/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2006 140 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Intervene and Unseal Documents filed by Lycos, Inc., Wired News. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 5/23/2006)
May 23, 2006 139 MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Documents filed by Lycos, Inc., Wired News. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 5/23/2006)
May 22, 2006 138 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/2006 before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 22, 2006 137 Declaration PROOF OF SERVICE filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 22, 2006 136 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel re 134 Memorandum in Support, MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S MAY 17, 2006 MINUTE ORDER (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 22, 2006 135 Declaration in Support of 134 Memorandum in Support, DECLARATION OF SHANA E. SCARLETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S MAY 17, 2006 MINUTE ORDER filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 22, 2006 134 MEMORANDUM in Support re 130 Motion Hearing PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S MAY 17, 2006 MINUTE ORDER filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 130 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 19, 2006 133 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene; Notice of Motion and Motion to Unseal Documents filed by USA Today, Associated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene and Motion to Unseal Documents# 2 Proposed Order Granting Motions for Leave to Intervene and Unseal Records)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 5/19/2006)
May 18, 2006 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel re 131 Notice of Appearance (Markman, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 18, 2006 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fram on behalf of Heller Ehrman LLP (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 17, 2006 305 MEMORANDUM in Support of Closure of Hearing filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2006)
May 17, 2006 130 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2006 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 5/17/2006) (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl) (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2006 129 Memorandum in Opposition TO MOTION TO SEAL; OPPOSITION TO CLOSURE OF COURTROOM; MOTION TO INTERVENE filed byAssociated Press, Bloomberg News, Los Angeles Times, San Francisco Chronicle, San Jose Mercury News. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 5/17/2006)
May 16, 2006 166 Letter from David L. Anderson, Attorney for Defendants, to the Honorable Vaughn R. Walker dated 5/16/2006 requesting that the Court hold a brief telepone confeence this afternoon to discuss the logistics for tomorrow's hearing on AT&T's motion to compel return of its confidential and proprietary documents and plaintiffs' motion to unseal certain documents that were filed under seal. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006)
May 16, 2006 128 Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative Motion of the USA to Set Hearing Date for Government Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Intervene filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/16/2006)
May 16, 2006 127 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 126 Motion for Enlargement of Pages by the United States of America. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006)
May 13, 2006 126 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/13/2006)
May 13, 2006 125 NOTICE by United States of America re 124 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Material (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/13/2006)
May 13, 2006 124 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/13/2006)
May 13, 2006 123 MOTION for Hearing re 122 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/13/2006)
May 13, 2006 122 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/13/2006)
May 11, 2006 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 5/11/06 by RWS. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
May 10, 2006 121 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement [Dkt. 109] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/10/2006)
May 8, 2006 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Defendant AT&T's Corp.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents [Dkt. 41-44] (filed under seal) (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 8, 2006 119 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 111 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 5, 2006 228 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documens [41-44] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 117 Notice (Other) Proof of Service Via U.S. Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 117 NOTICE by AT&T Corp. Notice of Manual Filing of Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents [DKT. 41-44] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 5, 2006 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Klein re 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae Certificate of Service by Mail (Martinez, Brian) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 4, 2006 115 Appendix re 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae Amicus Curiae Mark Klein's Submission of Legal Authority Regarding State Secrets Privilege filed byMark Klein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 1# 2 Exhibit Tab 2# 3 Exhibit Tab 3# 4 Exhibit Tab 4# 5 Exhibit Tab 5# 6 Exhibit Tab 6# 7 Exhibit Tab 7)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 114 Brief re 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae Brief of Amicus Curiae Mark Klein filed byMark Klein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 113 Proposed Order re 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae [Proposed] Order Granting Mark Klein's Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by Mark Klein. (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 112 Declaration of James J. Brosnahan in Support of 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae Declaration of James J. Brosnahan in Support of Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byMark Klein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Notice of Motion and Motion of Mark Klein for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by Mark Klein. (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 110 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 96 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentPlaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document From Docket is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk will remove document #93 from the court's electronic filing system.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 109 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 107 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Motions to Dismiss (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 4, 2006 107 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply in Support of Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Motions to Dismiss filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 3, 2006 106 Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative Motion for Order Shortening Time as to AT&T's Motion to Dismiss filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 3, 2006 105 Featured Case ORDER. On May 2, 2006, the court received a letter from a producer at CNBC requesting permission to film inside the undersigned's courtroom at the May 17, 2006 hearing. The court DENIES this request for the May 17 hearing but the issue of filming/taping may be re-considered for future hearings after the parties have been given notice and an opportunity to be heard and to advise the court on this issue. The court DIRECTS the clerk to place this letter in the file. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on May 2, 2006. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
May 2, 2006 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp. re 103 Letter Proof of Service Via US Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
May 2, 2006 103 Letter from Defendant AT&T Corp. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File Motion to Compel Discovery. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
May 2, 2006 102 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 5/11/06 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
May 1, 2006 227 NOTICE of 30(b)(6) Deposition of AT&T Corp. by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 101 Proposed Order re 99 Memorandum in Opposition TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. TO COMPEL RETURN OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 100 Declaration of KEVIN S. BANKSTON in Support of 99 Memorandum in Opposition TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. TO COMPEL RETURN OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 99 Memorandum in Opposition TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. TO COMPEL RETURN OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 98 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 97 Declaration of Cindy Cohn in Support of Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 96 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 95 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel of Manual Filing of Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of AT&T Corp. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
May 1, 2006 94 Letter from Plaintiffs re Discovery. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 28, 2006 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 86 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum, 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum, 80 Declaration in Support,, 88 Proposed Order,, 87 Request for Judicial Notice,, 89 MOTION to Dismiss Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, 81 Proposed Order,, 90 Declaration in Support,, 84 Response in Support,, 91 Proposed Order, Via U.S. Mail (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 91 Proposed Order re 89 MOTION to Dismiss Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, 90 Declaration in Support, [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion of Defendants AT&T Corp. to Specially Set the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 90 Declaration in Support of 89 MOTION to Dismiss Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byAT&T Corp.. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 89 MOTION to Dismiss Administrative Motion to Set Hearing Dates for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 88 Proposed Order re 86 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum, 87 Request for Judicial Notice, [Proposed] Order Granting AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by AT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 87 Request for Judicial Notice re 86 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byAT&T Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B through D# 4 Exhibit Exhibit E through J)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 86 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum filed by AT&T Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H Tannenbaum on Behalf of the United States of America (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 84 RESPONSE in Support Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Response to Brief of Amici Curiae Center for Constitutional Rights and American Civil Libeties Union in Opposition to Filing Documents Under Seal [DKT. 30-32] filed byAT&T Corp.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Coppolino on behalf of the United States of America (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 82 NOTICE by United States of America of First Statement of Interest of the United States (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 81 Proposed Order re 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum, 80 Declaration in Support, [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant AT&T, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 80 Declaration of Starlene Meyerkord in Support of 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum Declaration of Starlene Meyerkord in Support of Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed byAT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 28, 2006 79 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant AT&T, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum filed by AT&T Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 26, 2006 78 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING IN PART 45 Motion to Shorten Time, GRANTING 76 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. The court GRANTS IN PART defendants' motion for shortened time and sets the following briefing schedule. Oral argument is specially set for May 17, 2006, at 10:00 AM, on defendants' motion to compel and the parties' motions regarding sealing. Plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to compel is due on May 1, 2006, and defendants' reply is due on May 5, 2006. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is specially set for hearing on June 21, 2006, at 10:00 AM. Because plaintiffs were permitted additional pages to file their motion, defendants may file an opposition brief of up to 35 pages by May 18, 2006. Plaintiffs may file their reply brief by May 25, 2006. At the May 17 hearing, the parties may address case management and scheduling issues regarding other motions in this case. The court therefore vacates the initial case management conference currently set for May 16, 2006. Moreover, pursuant to a stipulation by the parties and Civ L R 7-11, the court accepts the brief filed by amici curiae Center for Constitutional Rights and the American Civil Liberties Union. Any response to this brief must be e-filed by April 28, 2006.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2006).
April 24, 2006 77 Brief re 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus filed byCenter for Constitutional Rights. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus filed by Center for Constitutional Rights. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 73 Stipulation Re: Participation of Amici Curiae in Civil Local Rule 79-5 Proceedings; and [Proposed] Order (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE VIA HAND DELIVERY (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 73 STIPULATION Re: Participation of Amici Curiae in Civil Local Rule 79-5 Proceedings; and [Proposed] Order by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 21, 2006 226 Reply Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [30-32] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 71 Notice (Other) of Manual Filing of AT&T Corp.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [DKT. 30-32] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 71 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. of Manual Filing of Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [DKT. 30-32] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 69 Response in Support To Order Regarding Recusal (DKT. 59) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 69 RESPONSE in Support To Order Regarding Recusal (DKT. 59) filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 68 Brief re: Recusal filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 66 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 66 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 20, 2006 65 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2006)
April 17, 2006 225 Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston in Support of 223 Opposition filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 223 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 224 EVIDENTIAY OBJECTIONS to Declaration of James W. Russell in Support of Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Compel Return of Confidential Documents by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 223 Opposition to Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [30-32] filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 64 Proposed Order re 63 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 61 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 62 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.'S TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 63 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JAMES W. RUSSELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. TO COMPEL RETURN OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 62 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel re 30 Notice (Other), 31 Notice (Other), 32 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF DECLARATION OF KEVIN S. BANKSTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DKT. 30-32] (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 61 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel re 30 Notice (Other), 31 Notice (Other), 32 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AT&T CORP.'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DKT. 30-32] (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel AMENDED DECLARATION OF SERVICE (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 14, 2006 59 Featured Case ORDER As in any case, the court has reviewed this matter for possible recusal. In this case, because of the circumstances and reasons discussed in this order, the court's review has been more extensive than in the usual instance. Although the court has reached the conclusion that recusal is not necessary here, the court has reached this conclusion without the benefit of guidance from the parties. Accordingly, the court invites the parties to submit on or before April 21, 2006, briefs no longer than 10 pages in length that address the matters stated above.Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on April 14, 2006. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006).
April 13, 2006 222 Opposition to Administrative Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. for Order Shortening Time as to AT&T's Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2006)
April 13, 2006 58 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel OF MANUAL FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION OF DEFENDANT AT&T CORP. FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AS TO AT&T'S MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/13/2006)
April 13, 2006 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE VIA HAND DELIVERY (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 4/13/2006)
April 13, 2006 56 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 57 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE VIA HAND DELIVERY (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 4/13/2006) Modified on 4/14/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2006 221 MEMORANDUM in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [30-32] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 55 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 24 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Bradford A. Berenson, David L. Lawson and Edward R. McNicholas. granting 25 , granting 26 . (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 54 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 23 Motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice David W. Carpenter (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 53 Proposed Order re 51 Notice (Other), 52 Declaration in Support of Sealing Documents [Dkt. 30-32] by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 52 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 51 Notice (Other) Sealing Documents [Dkt. 30-32] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 51 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 51 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. of Manual Filing of Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [Dkt. 30-32] (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 50 Proposed Order re 48 MOTION to Seal Motion of Defendants AT&T Corp. to File Under Seal Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [Dkt. 30-32], 49 Declaration in Support, by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 49 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 48 MOTION to Seal Motion of Defendants AT&T Corp. to File Under Seal Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [Dkt. 30-32] filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 12, 2006 48 MOTION to Seal Motion of Defendants AT&T Corp. to File Under Seal Defendant AT&T Corp.'s Memorandum in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal [Dkt. 30-32] filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 11, 2006 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE VIA HAND DELIVERY (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 11, 2006 46 Letter from Cindy A. Cohn re Administrative Motion for an Order Shortening Time. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 10, 2006 220 Declaration of James W. Russell in Support of 219 MOTION to Compel filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 219 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 219 MOTION to Compel Return of Confidential Documents; Supporting Memorandum filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 45 MOTION to Shorten Time (Administrative) of Defendant AT&T Corp. for Order Shortening Time as to AT&T's Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 44 Proposed Order re 43 Declaration in Support,, 41 Notice (Other), 42 Notice (Other) Regarding AT&T Corp. Confidential Documents by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 43 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 41 Notice (Other), 42 Notice (Other) of Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Compel Return of Confidential Documents filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-K)(Related document(s) 41 , 42 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 42 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 41 Notice (Other) of Manual Filing of Declaration of James W. Russell in Support of Motion to Defendant AT&T Corp. to Compel Return of Confidential Documents (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 41 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. of Manual Filing of Motion of Defendant AT&T Corp. to Compel Return of Confidential Documents; Supporting Memorandum (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 40 Proposed Order re 38 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents and Declaration of James W. Russell, 39 Declaration in Support, by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 39 Declaration of Bruce A. Ericson in Support of 38 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents and Declaration of James W. Russell filed byAT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 38 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Return of Confidential Documents and Declaration of James W. Russell filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 10, 2006 37 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a memorandum of points and authorities of 35 pages in support of their motion for preliminary injunction. (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 5, 2006 231 Declaration of J. Scott Marcus in Support of 229 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 229 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 230 Declaration of Mark Klein in Support of 229 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 229 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 229 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Benson B. Roe, Carolyn Jewel. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 35 Declaration of LEE TIEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO LODGE AND TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 34 Proposed Order REGARDING THE LODGING OF DOCUMENTS by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 33 MOTION to Seal Document RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, DECLARATIONS OF MARK KLEIN AND J. SCOTT MARCUS filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 32 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel OF MANUAL FILING OF DECLARATION OF J. SCOTT MARCUS (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 31 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel OF MANUAL FILING OF DECLARATION OF MARK KLEIN (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 30 NOTICE by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel OF MANUAL FILING OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 29 Proposed Order REGARDING THE MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 4, 2006 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Proposed Order, (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 Proposed Order granting 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Edward R. McNicholas filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Fee paid - 3384004. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David L. Lawson filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Fee paid - 3384005. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Bradford A. Berenson filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Fee paid 3384003. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
April 4, 2006 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David W. Carpenter filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. Fee paid - 3384002. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
March 31, 2006 22 Declaration of Lee Tien in Support of 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 21 Proposed Order re 20 Request for Judicial Notice, by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 20 Request for Judicial Notice re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 19 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 18 Declaration of Carolyn Jewel in Support of 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 17 Proposed Order re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 31, 2006 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 30, 2006 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Roy Wiebe as additional counsel for plaintiffs and the plaintiff class (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 6, 2006 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. re 13 Stipulation Setting Uniform Time For Defendants And Possible Intervener to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
March 6, 2006 13 STIPULATION SETTING UNIFORM TIME FOR DEFENDANTS AND POSSIBLE INTERVENER TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
February 28, 2006 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel. AT&T Corp. served on 2/24/2006, answer due 3/16/2006; AT&T Inc. served on 2/24/2006, answer due 3/16/2006. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
February 27, 2006 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Isaacson NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ERIC A. ISAACSON (Isaacson, Eric) (Filed on 2/27/2006)
February 23, 2006 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2006)
February 23, 2006 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2006)
February 23, 2006 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria V. Morris NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Morris, Maria) (Filed on 2/23/2006)
February 22, 2006 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. Filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/22/2006)
February 13, 2006 7 CLERK'S NOTICE : Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2006 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2006. (Attachments: # 1 # 2) (cgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2006)
February 3, 2006 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff D Friedman (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/3/2006)
January 31, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case.Signed by Executive Committee on 1/31/06. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2006 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 31, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 31, 2006 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 31, 2006 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks and Erik Knutzen (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 31, 2006 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2006. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2006 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 CMC Standing Order# 2 Standing Order #2)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 31, 2006 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc. (Filing fee $ 250.00, receipt number 3381033.). Filed byGregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen, Tash Hepting. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hepting et al v. AT&T Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?