Beauperthuy et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00715
Filed: February 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Final Order on Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on September 11, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 580 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 569 Motion for Settlement; granting 572 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
April 22, 2013 568 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti APPROVING 561 Preliminary Approval of Individual Settlements.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
February 28, 2013 567 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/28/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
August 28, 2012 536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Duties of Special Master. 24 Hour Fitness's Motion to Dismiss 535 is referred to the Special Master and the hearing date set for October 5, 2012 before Judge Conti is vacated. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/28/2012. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
April 26, 2012 507 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Modifying Special Master's Report and Recommendation re: Selection Process for First 16 Arbitrators.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/26/2012. (sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
December 16, 2011 466 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 462 Motion to Shorten Time (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 2, 2011 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 432 Motion to Compel Arbitration as Amended by 449 Amendment to Motion to Compel Arbitration (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
June 10, 2011 446 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Motion to Compel Arbitration and Case Management Conference from 7/8/11 to 9/9/11 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/9/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 430 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Scheduling Order and/or Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/10/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 24, 2011 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 362 Motion to Decertify Conditional FLSA Trainer Class; granting 371 Motion to Decertify Conditional FLSA Manager Class; denying 403 Motion to Strike ; denying 405 Motion to Strike ; denying 414 Motion to Strike (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 9, 2011 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Surreply. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/9/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
November 22, 2010 408 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY BRIEFING ISO MOTIONS TO DECERTIFY CONDITIONAL FLSA TRAINER CLASS AND MANAGER CLASS. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/22/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
May 6, 2010 357 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Expert Designation Date from 5/24/10 to 6/28/10. THIS IS THE LAST EXTENSION THAT WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/6/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
January 25, 2010 354 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline And Increasing The Number of Depositions: non-expert discovery cutoff 4/23/10, expert designations 5/24/10, expert discovery cutoff 8/6/10, last day to file dispositive motions 8/22/10. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/22/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
December 3, 2009 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating show-cause hearing. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/3/2009. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 10, 2009 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 295 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 297 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 340 Motion (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 8, 2009 322 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadlline to File Opposition to Motion to Extend Discovery and Increase the Number of Depositions. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/8/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
August 20, 2009 294 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 292 Letter, filed by Evan Sooper, Kimberly S. Struble, Danielle Relph, Jason A. Digennaro, Brandon F. Neil, Danual Meyers, Kelly Fennelly, Brian Harrington Lewis, Rebecca L. Tobin, Matthew Reitter, Corey Fobes, Alexis Covarrubias , Steve Orrico, James Reed, Nathaniel Hoelk, John Nesmith, Michael Chalmers, Timothy F. Paudler, Sean W. Lee, David L. Guy, Patrick A. Frey, William E. Rainaldo, Jr., Lawrence O'Neill Dickerson, Lindsay D'errico, Chad V. Ruf, Jason Valley, Antoinette Fiedler, John Davidsson, David Kaipi, Alfred Ra'oof, Kyle Phillips, Anthony Romeo, Nathaniel Fennell, Christopher Vincent, Ryan Parker, Bobby De Soto, Mark White, Anne Dillon, Heidi Gabalski, Sabrina Priesman, Matthew Popelka, Annie O stolasa, Garrett Hopkins, Adam L. Vest, Gabe Beauperthuy, Kristopher Michael Martino, David Wood, Jude M. Montoya, Goreal Hudson, James Edward Morey, Andrew W. Newcomb, Joshua Woodson, John Udden, Adam Sherrill, James L. Ogden, Quin Kaplan. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
May 28, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Increasing the Number of Depositions. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/28/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009) Modified on 7/2/2009 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2008 240 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline To File Personal Trainer Opt-In Forms to 11/24/08. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/3/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauperthuy et al v. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?