Vedachalam v. Tata America International Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00963
Filed: February 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE, re doc 143 . Plaintiffs' Opening Brief in support of the Motion for Class Certification shall be served and filed no later than FEBRUARY 3, 2011. Defendants' Opposition Brief shall be served and filed no later than MARCH 10, 2011. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief due no later than MARCH 31, 2011. The hearing currently set for December 16, 2010 is rescheduled for APRIL 14, 2011 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/24/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 13, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 139 Letter filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, Tata America International Corporation, Tata Sons, Ltd, 138 Letter filed by Kangana Beri, Gopi Vedachalam. Defendants are DIRECTED to prepare and produce a privilege log by not later than September 24, 2010. The parties shall inform the court in writing of any remaining disputes associated with RFP no 9 not later than October 1, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
July 20, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINES, re 136 filed by Gopi Vedachalam. Based on the parties stipulation, the class certification briefing shall proceed and the hearing shall be set as follows: Plaintiffs' Motion for Cl ass Certification currently set for hearing on 10/7/2010 is re-set for hearing on 12/16/2010 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiffs' shall file and serve the Motion for Class Certification by no later than 10/7/2010. Defendants' Opposition shall be due no later than 11/15/2010. Reply Brief shall be due no later than 12/2/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/20/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vedachalam v. Tata America International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?