Miles v. Makishima et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01295
Filed: February 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR DIRECT APPEAL CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 7, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 2, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Miles v. Makishima, et al., C-08-4091 JSW, and Miles v. Makishima, et al., C-08-4375 MHP, are related to Miles v. Makishima, et al., C-06-1295 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 29, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL. The Notice of Removal is stricken, and the action is remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Mateo. No further filings shall be accepted in this closed case. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Makishima et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?