Smith v. Plummer

Case Number: 3:2006cv01637
Filed: March 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION 57 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 3, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURTS STANDING ORDERS. Petitioner is ordered to comply with General Order 45 and the Courts Standing Orders by immediately submitting a chambers copy of his opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/3/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
June 15, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 1, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 3, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The above-titled petition is hereby DENIED, in favor of Charles Plummer against Ronald Edward Smith (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 9, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE. Petitioner's traverse shall be filed no later than May 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 12, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE. Petitioner's traverse shall be filed no later than April 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 9, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING ENLARGEMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE. Petitioner's traverse shall be filed no later than March 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF TRAVERSE. If petitioner wishes to file a traverse to respondent's answer to the petition, such traverse shall be filed no later than February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 10, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 19, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
October 30, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?