Doe et al v. Hagee et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01777
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2007 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing federal defendants due to settlement; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/20/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 7, 2007 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COMPROMISE SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE OF CLAIMS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
May 24, 2007 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER amending briefing schedule: Motion to be filed by 6/15/07; Oppositions to be filed by 7/2/07; Replies by 7/9/07; Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2007 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/23/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Hagee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?