National Federation of the Blind et al v. Target Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff National Federation of the Blind, the National Federation of the Blind of California, and Bruce Sexton alleged that defendant Target Corporation violated Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act, California's Unruh Civil Rights Act, and California's Blind and Other Physically Disabled Persons Act because its website contains thousands of access barriers, such as the lack of alt-text on graphics, inaccessible image maps, and mouse-only driven transactions that make it difficult if not impossible for blind customers to use.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind, the National Federation of the Blind of California, Bruce Frank Sexton, Melissa Williamson and James P. Marks
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2006cv01802
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED; Attorneys fees and costs shall be awarded in the amount of $3,738,864.96; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by James P. Marks, National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, Melissa Williamson, the National Federation of the Blind of California of Motion re: Matter Under Submission for More Than 120 Days (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-09-09, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2009. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Letter from Larry Paradis. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Final Judgment And ORDER Approving Settlement And Dismissing Claims re 177 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Release filed by James P. Marks, National Federation of the Blind, Target Corporation, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California, Melissa Williamson. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/9/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 3/9/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 3/9/2009). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND (Proposed) ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 CLERKS NOTICE: Motion Hearing reset from 1/26/2009 to 3/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Declaration of Claims Administrator filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Declaration of Laurence Paradis in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Declaration of Judith Z. Gold in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Declaration of Daniel S. Mason in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Declaration of William F. Alderman in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Declaration of Sanford Jay Rosen in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Declaration of Joshua Konecky in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Declaration of Daniel F. Goldstein in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of 183 Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (far, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of 195 Proposed Order, 194 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Fees and Costs filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 195 , 194 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Proposed Order re 194 Memorandum in Opposition [Proposed] Order Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Defendant Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byTarget Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Proposed Order Granting 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Declaration of Sanford Jay Rosen in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Declaration of Richard M. Pearl in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Declaration of Daniel S. Mason in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Declaration of Joshua Konecky in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Declaration of Daniel F. Goldstein in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Declaration of Judith Z. Gold in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Declaration of Linda M. Dardarian in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Declaration of William F. Alderman in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting Preliminary approval of class settlement; conditionally certifying settlement classes; directing issuance of notice; Scheduling hearing on Final approval for 1/26/2009 at 2:00 pm (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2008 before Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 9/24/2008) re 177 178 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Preliminary Approval (Court Reporter Margo Garule.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CLERK'S NOTICE: Hearing on motions for preliminary approval of settlement set for 9/24/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of 177 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Release, 178 Joint MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval)Joint MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed byTarget Corporation, National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 177 , 178 ) (Goldstein, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Joint MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Target Corporation, National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Notice (Long), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice (Short), # 3 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Release filed by Target Corporation, National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Form & Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Approval Order, # 3 Exhibit C - TOATG, # 4 Exhibit D - Agreed Changes, # 5 Exhibit E - Transaction Paths, # 6 Exhibit F - Press Release)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/3/2009 08:30 AM; Final dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2009; Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2009 02:30 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/22/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Case Management Order by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Letter Brief Re: Final Class Notice filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING FORM OF NOTICE AND NOTICE DISTRIBUTION PLAN; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/24/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/24/06 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTarget Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 1/17/2008)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/10/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2008)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 154 defendant's Motion to Strike 2nd Amended Complaint and to dismiss ADA claims (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER of USCA 07-80179 that the Petitioner's motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The petition for permission to appeal the district court's order granting class action certification is denied. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Proposed Order approving form of notice and notice distribution plan by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Letter from Roger Heller regarding notice to the class and distribution list. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Reply Memorandum Target Corporation's Reply Memorandum In Support of its Motion to Strike the Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the Americans With Disabilities Act filed byTarget Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 162 Motion to amended and amending minute entry re 12/10/07 Status Conference (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief for Correction of Civil Pretrial Minutes by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Amend/Correct 161 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Status Conference Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Correct Civil Pretrial Minutes filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 12/10/2007 before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 12/11/2007). (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzales.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2007)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike the Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims under the ADA filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Conference set for 12/10/2007 03:00 AM. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE by Target Corporation Target Corporation's Revised Rule 26(f) Proposed Discovery Plan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement filed by National Federation of the Blind, Melissa Williamson, James P. Marks, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation re 154 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the Americans With Disabilities Act; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 155 Proposed Order, (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Proposed Order re 154 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the Americans With Disabilities Act; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Complaint and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims Under the Americans With Disabilities Act; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Target Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Letter Brief Regarding Proposed Class Notice and Related Issues filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Notice of Class Action)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE by Target Corporation Defendant's Proposed Class Action Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Damages against Target Corporation. Filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 146 defendant's Motion for Leave to File statement of recent decision (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: 1) Plaintiffs motion to certify a class is GRANTED; 2) The nationwide class consists of all legally blind individuals in the United States who have attempted to access Target.com and as a result have been denied access to the enjoyment of goods and services offered in Target stores. The California subclass includes all legally blind individuals in California who have attempted to access Target.com, for plaintiffs claims arising under the California Unruh Civil Rights Act, California Civil Code §§ 51 et seq. and the Disabled Persons Act, California Civil Code §§ 54 et seq.; 3) Plaintiffs are ordered to substitute a new class representative with respect to the ADA claims consistent with this order within thirty (30) days of the date of this order; 4) The counsel of named plaintiff shall serve as counsel for the class; 5) Defendants motion to strike Taylors supplementary declaration is GRANTED; 6) Plaintiffs motion for bifurcation of trial is GRANTED; 7) Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED subject to the provisions of this order: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall confer and submit a proposed class notice in compliance with this order within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Within thirty (30) days, counsel shall also set forth a class commencement date that is to be included in the definition of the class. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Proposed Order re 146 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision by Target Corporation. (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of 146 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed byTarget Corporation. (Related document(s) 146 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2007 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 8/1/2007) re 115 MOTION to Strike, 86 136 MOTION to Certify Class, 77 MOTION to Bifurcate, 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2007)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Supplemental Brief in Support of 86 Motion for Class Certification filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Decl of Denise Altobelli# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of 138 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Declaration of Patricia Perry in Support of 138 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Related document(s) 138 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Brief Target Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 74 Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 7/16/2007) Modified on 7/18/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/31/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be heard 7/31/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 132 plaintiffs' Motion for attorney Mehgan Sidhu Capek to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Mehgan Sidhu Capek Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611007101) filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Received Order re 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611007101) by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/31/2007) re 128 MOTION Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions; Counsel submit after further discussion of proposed motion; Depositions (not more than ten) of declarants to be completed not later than 7/1/2007; Defendant?s supplemental briefing to be filed not later than 7/16/2007; Plaintiffs? supplemental briefing to be filed not later than 7/25/2007; Further hearing set for 2:00 pm on 7/31/2007,(Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2007)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Proposed Order re 128 MOTION Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions Target Corporation's Administrative Motion Requesting a Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions [Proposed] Order Granting Target Corporation's Administrative Motion Requesting a Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions by Target Corporation. (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of 128 MOTION Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions Target Corporation's Administrative Motion Requesting a Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 128 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions Target Corporation's Administrative Motion Requesting a Briefing Schedule and Further Depositions filed by Target Corporation. (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 5/29/2007)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Appendix of Supplemental Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Parts 1-4) filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ERRATA Sheet to Correct Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding State Law Claims by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of 124 Brief Declaration of Kristina Paszek in Support of Target Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Brief Target Corporation's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Declaration of Dr. James W. Thatcher In Support of 121 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding State Law Claims filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/26/2007) Modified on 4/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Declaration of Roger Heller In Support of 121 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding State Law Claims filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - E)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/26/2007) Modified on 4/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Brief Supplementing Plaintiffs' State Law Claims filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 5/1/07 motions hearing pending further briefing re 119 . (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Motions for Class Certification; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/25/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 4/12/2007) re 115 109 77 86 (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzales.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2007)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Elizabeth Brill (Brill, Rachel) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/9/2007)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Strike 109 Declaration in Support, filed by Target Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2007)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing: Plaintiffs' Motions for class certification/bifurcation reset for 4/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of 112 Reply to Opposition In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Reply to Opposition re 104 Memorandum in Opposition Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTarget Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Bifurcation filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Konecky, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Konecky, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Declaration of Anne Taylor in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Konecky, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2007)
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts Re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/27/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Declaration of Bruce F. Sexton In Support of 104 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Declaration of Daniel Brome In Support of 104 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Declaration of Roger Heller in Support of Plaintiff's 104 Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 90 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/26/2007) Modified on 4/19/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification/Bifurcation AND Defendant's Motion for summary judgment reset to 5/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Statement of Non-Opposition to 93 Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time and Request for Relief from Briefing Schedule filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 3/13/2007) Modified on 3/14/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Proposed Order re 100 Memorandum in Opposition [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Bifurcation of Issues at Trial by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Memorandum in Opposition to 77 Plaintiffs' Motion for Bifurcation of Issues at Trial filed by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007) Modified on 3/9/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Proposed Order re 96 Memorandum in Opposition [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of 96 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 96 ) (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Declaration of Trish Perry in Support of 96 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Trish Perry in Support of Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Related document(s) 96 ) (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Memorandum in Opposition to 86 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byTarget Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007) Modified on 3/9/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Proposed Order re 93 MOTION to Shorten Time Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Shorten Time; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities [Proposed] Order Granting Target Corporation's Motion to Shorten Time by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of 93 MOTION to Shorten Time Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Shorten Time; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of Target Corporation's Motion to Shorten Time filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Shorten Time Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Shorten Time; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Proposed Order re 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities [Proposed] Order Granting Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Target Corporation. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger in Support of Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment Target Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Target Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Kreeger, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 74 MOTION to Seal Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of Laurence Paradis filed by National Federation of the Blind. Motion Granted in part, Denied in part. Plaintiffs shall file redacted copies in the public record and seal only those portions that contain the described deposition testimony. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/12/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007)
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 74 MOTION to Seal Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of Laurence Paradis filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paszek, Kristina) (Filed on 2/8/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of 136 MOTION to Certify Class filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 136 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Declaration of Laurence W. Paradis in Support of 86 MOTION for Class Certification PUBLIC VERSION REDACTED filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 86 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities PUBLIC VERSION REDACTED filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Appendix of Additional Class Member Declarations, Part Two, with Exhibits G - N filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Appendix of Additional Class Member Declarations, with Exhibits A - F filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Declaration of Daniel Brome in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Declaration of Robert Stigile in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Declaration of Daniel F. Goldstein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Declaration of Joshua Konecky in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and Bifurcation by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Bifurcate Issues at Trial filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2007 02:30 PM. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California of Manual Filing (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California of Manual Filing (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Seal Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of Laurence Paradis filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2007 02:30 PM. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 72 Proposed Order filed by Target Corporation. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/19/06. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Proposed Order Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order by Target Corporation. (Ferrer, Mary) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/06 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
October 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Minute Entry: Status Conference before the Hon Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 10/24/2006). (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzales.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2006)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (McElhinny, Harold) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER of SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Roger Norton Heller for plaintiffs added; Attorney Mazen Mohammed Basrawi terminated; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/4/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Laurence W. Paradis (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TARGET CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTarget Corporation. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 64 Motion for attorney Peter Blanck to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2006)
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 57 plaintiffs' Motion for relief from General Order 56; Parties shall appear for a case management conference on October 23, 2006 at 3:00 pm, with a joint cmc statement to be filed ten (10) days prior. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Peter Blanck Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid $210.00, receipt number 3389731) filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Received Order re 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 5 defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 20 plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2006)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Robert Naeve in Oppositition to Motion for Administrative Relief filed byTarget Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Administrative Relief filed byTarget Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2006)
September 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Declaration of Laurence Paradis in Support of 57 Third MOTION Relief from General Order 56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief from General Order 56 filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
September 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Third MOTION Relief from General Order 56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief from General Order 56 filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2006 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 7/25/2006) re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2006)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 52 Objection to Evidence and Motion to Strike filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 52 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Proposed Order re 53 Reply Memorandum, Motion for Leave to File Surreply and Surrebuttal by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Surreply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OBJECTIONS to , and Motion to Strike, Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2006)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Target Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Surreply Brief in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2006)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 First MOTION Leave to File Surreply Brief filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2006)
July 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ERRATA re 42 Reply to Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California, National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED Declaration of Laurence Paradis in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Amendment to 42 Reply to Opposition . (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/11/2006) Modified on 7/21/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Declaration of Heather Akers-Healy in Support of 42 Reply to Opposition Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Related document(s) 42 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Yelena Trepetin in Support of 42 Reply to Opposition Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of James Thatcher in Support of 42 Reply to Opposition Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Declaration of Bruce Sexton in Support of 42 Reply to Opposition Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Declaration of Laurence Paradis in Support of 42 Reply to Opposition Re: Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14)(Related document(s) 42 ) (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Reply to Opposition to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed byTarget Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 7/10/2006)
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Proposed Order 29 Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Michael J. Bostrom Regarding Technical Failure of the Northern District's Electronic Filing Website filed byTarget Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Declaration of Charles Letourneau In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Declaration of Trish Perry In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Declaration of Paul Schutz In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration of Gregg Bodnar In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Suzanne Tritten In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Dave Wilkinson In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Declaration of Chris Polk In Support of 29 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Declaration of Dawn Wilkinson In Support of 29 Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Declaration of Michael J. Bostrom In Support of 29 Target Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bostrom Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Bostrom Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Bostrom Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Bostrom Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Bostrom Decl.# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Bostrom Decl.# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Bostrom Decl.# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Bostrom Decl.# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Bostrom Decl.# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Bostrom Decl.# 11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Bostrom Decl.# 12 Exhibit Exhibit L to Bostrom Decl.)(Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Opposition To 20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/13/2006) Modified on 6/14/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Memorandum in Opposition re 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byNational Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Target's Motion to Dismiss# 2 Request For Judicial Notice# 3 Declaration of Camilla L. Roberson# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 25 defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (NOT TO EXCEED 35 PAGES) as to opposition to NFB's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2006)
June 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposed Order Granting Target Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief to Exceed Page Limitation for Its Opposition to NFB's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its opposition to NFB's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions 5 16 20 for 7/24/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Oppositions to be filed by 6/12/2006; Replies to be filed by 7/10/2006; Stay of limited discovery lifted; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/2/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2006)
June 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and [proposed] order by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 6/1/2006)
May 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Hearings on Motions 16 20 for 6/26/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco AND GRANTING leave for defendant to take limited discvoery; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/11/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2006)
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2006)
May 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dr. James W. Thatcher# 2 Affidavit of Marc Maurer# 3 Affidavit of Anne Taylor# 4 Affidavit of Bruce F. Sexton# 5 Affidavit of Bob Ayala# 6 Affidavit of Tim Elder# 7 Affidavit of Steve Jacobson# 8 Affidavit of Robert Stigile# 9 Affidavit of Tina Thomas# 10 Affidavit of Terri Uttermohlen# 11 Affidavit of Ken Volonte# 12 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Paradis, Laurence) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 18 plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file motion for preliminary injunction within ten days of this order. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2006)
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION Administrative Relief from General Order No. 56 for the Limited Purpose of Filing a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by National Federation of the Blind, Bruce Frank Sexton, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Proposed Order)(Basrawi, Mazen) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Target Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 14 defendant's Motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss within ten days (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2006)
April 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation. Filed byBruce Frank Sexton, National Federation of the Blind, the National Federation of the Blind of California. (Basrawi, Mazen) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 9 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Daniel F Goldstein to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/24/06. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Federation of the Blind, the National Federation of the Blind of California re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice & Proposed Order. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION of Attorney Daniel F. Goldstein for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice [Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 3383279]. Filed by Plaintiffs National Federation of the Blind & the National Federation of the Blind of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Granting re 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs National Federation of the Blind and the National Federation of the Blind of California. (tn, COURT STAFF)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Target Corporation and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Target Corporation. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Target Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Naeve, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation (McDowell, David) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Filed by DefendantTarget Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG-06-254127. [Filing Fee: $250.00, Receipt Number 4412452]. Filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Federation of the Blind et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: the National Federation of the Blind of California
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Frank Sexton
Represented By: Laurence Wayne Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Williamson
Represented By: Laurence Wayne Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Marks
Represented By: Laurence Wayne Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?