Ray et al v. Bluehippo Funding, LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01807
Filed: March 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2015 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Status Report on Bankruptcy Proceedings. Status Report due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
January 27, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 27, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 6, 2010 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL DATES AND REQUIRING FILING RE EFFECT OF BANKRUPTCY STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
September 23, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 23, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 4, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 303 Stipulation to Change Hearing Time and RESOLVING 304 MOTION to Continue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 4, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 1, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 1, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
July 9, 2009 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Estrada's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 9, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
May 18, 2009 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ESTRADA'S MOTITON TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
March 31, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 258 Case Management Conference (stay of this litigation is continued until 4/7/2009 to allow parties to submit a motion) filed by Bluehippo Funding, LLC, Bluehippo Capital, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/31/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 20, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Case Management Statement Continuing Stay of Litigation until March 31, 2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 3, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 254 Progress of Settlement Documentation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
January 29, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 250 Request of all Parties for Thirty Day Stay of Deadlines to Permit Preparation of Documentation for Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 21, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 245 Parties' Joint Letter of January 16, 2009 (Modification of Protective Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 244 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 7, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/09. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 11, 2008 237 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2009 AT 9:30 AM before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements to be LODGED with chambers 14 days prior to the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/10/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 10, 2008 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 234 Stipulation to Modify Schedule and Referral to Magistrate Spero for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 10, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 5, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 231 Stipulation filed by Bluehippo Funding, LLC, Bluehippo Capital, LLC. 12/10 hearing and meet and conference off calendar.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 1, 2008 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Rescheduling Meet and Confer and Hearing. The Court shall not waive the in-person meet and confer requirement. However, it shall reschedule the in-person meet and confer to December 10, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. There shall be a hearing at 3:00 p.m. on the same date if the disputes are not resolved at the in-person meet and confer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 25, 2008 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 178 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 6, 2008 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying in Part 210 Third-Party and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 8, 2008 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 205 Stipulation Regarding Confidentiality of Settlement Discussions in Connection with Contemplated November 10, 2008 Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 30, 2008 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Conference Call on September 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 24, 2008 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 200 Defendants' Motion to Change Time; and denying without prejudice Defendants' Request for Local Counsel Participation (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 10, 2008 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Hearing on September 10, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 2, 2008 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 189 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Out-of-Town Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
March 14, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 MOTION for leave for Gary Peller to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/13/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006)
March 9, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Marshall filed by Roylene Ray, Kelly Cannon. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 3/9/06. (kch, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. Bluehippo Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?