Jacobsen v. Katzer et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01905
Filed: March 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: James Larson
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2010 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
December 21, 2009 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 397 Stipulation re Pretrial and Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 21, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 10, 2009 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 343 , 365 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 352 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 3, 2009 393 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 10, 2009 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 356 Stipulation Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 10, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 22, 2009 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 339 MOTION TO Change expert discovery deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 28, 2009 337 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION re 326 Stipulation filed by Matthew Katzer, Kamind Associates,Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/25/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
August 21, 2009 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 324 First MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 21, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 12, 2009 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
May 29, 2009 306 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/29/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 14, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
January 9, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Further Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/9/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 5, 2009 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 236 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; DENYING 267 Motion to Strike Declarations; DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 192 Third MOTION to Dismiss; DENYING Motion to Strike; GRANTING 203 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; GRANTING 272 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply; and DENYING 273 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 17, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
February 1, 2008 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 1, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobsen v. Katzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?