Walters et al v. Golden Gate Crane & Rigging, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv01906
Filed: March 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 25, 2012 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/08/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
January 17, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 153 SETTING DEBTORS EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ROBERT NEWBERRY by John Bonilla, Trustees of the Operating Engineers & Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice & Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation and Holiday Plan, Trustees of the Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Trustees of the Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Ken Walters. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 4/25/2012 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/17/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 6, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 149 Plaintiffs' Request for Reconsideration of January 3, 2012 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/06/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING DEBTORS EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ROBERT NEWBERRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 7, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Debtor's Examination of Judgment Debtor Robert Newberry, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2011. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/18/2012 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/07/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 3, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 138 Oct. 24, 2011 Letter re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/03/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 31, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution Issued as to Golden Gate Crane & Rigging, Inc.; Robert Newberry; and Sue Newberry; $325,880.27. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
March 13, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters et al v. Golden Gate Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?