Franklin et al v. Allstate Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01909
Filed: March 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
December 24, 2008 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING RAS DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 24, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 10, 2008 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS OPPORTUNITY TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs shall file, no later than December 26, 2008, a supplement to their motion, curing the noted deficiencies. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
September 17, 2008 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
February 8, 2008 163 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 159 Motion to Reconsider; Approving Minors' Compromise Incident to Settlement; Vacating hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 154 Order Approving Minors' Compromise; Resetting Hearing. The hearing on the Second Amended Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise is reset for February 8, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Second Amended Petition for Approval of Minors' Compromise; vacating hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
March 17, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney denying 3 Plaintiff's application for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 14, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on 3 plaintiffs' ex parte application for temporary restraining order until Friday, March 17, 2006, to afford plaintiffs the opportunity to serve the defendants and file proof of such service, or to file the certification required by Rule 65(b). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/14/2006. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin et al v. Allstate Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?