Vinovation, Inc. et al v. VA Filtration USA LLC

Case Number: 3:2006cv02026
Filed: March 16, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 93 Stipulation for Second Extension of Conditional Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 6, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 23, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 91 Stipulation to Extend Conditional Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 23, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
February 18, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 88 JOINT REQUEST FOR 30-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 2, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 66 Amended STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/2/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 10, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Stipulation For Request for Order Enlarging Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
November 13, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 61 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 13, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 10, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulated Request for Fourth Order Enlarging Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 10, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 2, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 20, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 Stipulation Requesting For Order Enlarging Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Jeffey S. White on 10/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
August 17, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 51 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 11, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS (correction of Claims Construction Hearing Date only). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 10, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
May 19, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Status Report and Scheduling a Status Conference.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinovation, Inc. et al v. VA Filtration USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?