Rendon v. Chertoff et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02060
Filed: March 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. Respondent's return is due May 9, 2006, petitioner's reply is due May 16, 2006, and the Court will conduct a hearing on the petition May 26, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. The order to show cause, filed March 23, 2006, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)
March 21, 2006 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PENDING MARCH 24, 2006 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 21, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)
March 20, 2006 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rendon v. Chertoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?