Hawkins v. Alameda Contra Costa Transit District

Case Number: 3:2006cv02183
Filed: March 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 4, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 12/11/2008 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/8/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2008.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/3/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Alameda Contra Costa Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?