Pacific Information Resources, Inc., v. Musselman et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02306
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2008 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Because plaintiff's claims against each defendant have been resolved, and the Clerk has closed the case, the Case Management Conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS AIRON CORPORATION, ALEXI BORISOV AND LEVON GASPARIAN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 12, 2008 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Lewis Bribois Bisgaard & Smith LLP is substituted in place and stead of Novo Law Group, P.C., and Konrad L. Trope. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
February 7, 2008 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AIRON CORPORATION, ALEXEI BORISOV AND LEVON GASPARIAN'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 4, 2008 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ATTEND CASE STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE. All parties shall appear telephonically at the February 8, 2008 Status Conference. Defendant Diana Musselman is ordered to contact the Deputy Clerk and provide, no later than February 7, 2008 by 5:00 p.m., Pacific Standard Time, a telephone number where she may be reached. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 1, 2008 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE. The "Motion of Defendants Peter Dunbar, Renee Dunbar, Paretologic Inc., Elton Pereira, Adrian Pereira and Jason Carvalho for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication," the "Airon Defendants' ; Motion for Summary Judgment," and "Defendants Airon Corporation, Alexei Borisov and Levon Gasparian's Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief" are referred to the Honorable Wm. Fremming Nielsen. The parties will be advised of the date, time and place of the hearing on said motions by notice from Judge Nielsen's chambers. The February 22, 2008 hearing before the undersigned is vacated.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Information Resources, Inc., v. Musselman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?