Abernathy et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02437
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Timothy Myers and Willis C. Shelton terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
October 22, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 44 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., Joseph L. Clough, Mary F. Hutcheson, Julia Lane, Debbie Madrey, Rickey McDaniel, Calvin W. Miller, Karla Miller, Edward Myers, Catheryn Parham, Tilda Powls, Patty Preston , Janice S. Rankin, Jannie B. Reed, Willard L. Rivers, Thomas W. Scollon, Hermie Marie Scott, Billy J. Smithers, Lillian Sweeney, Ellen M. Talley, Charles Tate, Paul Terry, Gary Lee Abernathy and Janelle Blanton terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/22/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
May 19, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 40 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., Cynthia Mitchell terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/14/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 14, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying plaintiff's name on docket (Cynthia Mitchell). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/14/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abernathy et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?