Storus Corporation v. Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02454
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2008 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED APPLICATION TO EXTEND DATES FOR PRE-TRIAL DELIVERABLES. The deadline to file the pre-trial statement and joint instructions is continued to February 19, 2008. The deadline to file motions in limine is continued to February 15, 2008; the deadline to file oppositions is continued to February 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 7, 2008 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. In light of a recent change in the Court's trial schedule, the reference to Judge Nielsen is withdrawn. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for parti al summary judgment, the Court finds plaintiff's motion appropriate for resolution on the papers, and, accordingly, deems the matter submitted on the papers. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 1, 2008 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Trademark Infringement is referred to the Honorable Wm. Fremming Nielsen. Counsel will be advised of the date, time and place of the hearing on said motion by notice from Judge Nielsen's chambers. The February 1, 2008 hearing before the undersigned is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storus Corporation v. Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?