Conley et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02484
Filed: April 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS IN CASE 06-2484. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/27/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
February 5, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Barbara Liotto and Barry Rose terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
April 28, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 15 Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc., Charles Mosley; Geraldine Weaver; Rick Handley and Theresa Lawson terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?