King v. Horel et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02606
Filed: April 18, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELIEVING JOHN HALLEY AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
December 30, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 18, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED., ***Civil Case Terminated. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
April 26, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the petition upon respondent. Respondent shall file, within 30 days of the date of service of this order, either a motion to dismiss or an answer to the petition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2006. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Horel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?