Cummings et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02690
Filed: April 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Juliette Reine and Mack Reine, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
March 13, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re (15 in 3:06-cv-02690-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc.,Letitia Defillo terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 25, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause why motion to withdraw should not be granted and case dismissed (Letitia Defillo, 06-2690). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/25/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 12, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re attorney declaration for motion to withdraw (Letitia Defillo, 06-2690). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
December 19, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re (6 in 3:06-cv-02690-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., John Shea terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?