Minority Television Project Inc. v. Federal Communications Commission et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02699
Filed: April 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 72 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by Minority Television Project Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/19/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
July 1, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING Case Management and Pretrial Order for Court Trial: Pretrial Conference continued to 11/17/2009 02:00 PM. Court Trial set for 12/7/2009 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/1/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
April 27, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulation filed by Minority Television Project Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 24, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 26, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 4, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING DISPOSITIVE MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 4, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
September 11, 2008 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR COURT TRIAL: Non-expert discovery shall close 12/1/2008. Expert discovery shall be completed by 2/20/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2009 10:00 AM. Last day to hear dispostive motions 6/2/2009 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2009 02:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 8/17/2009 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/11/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minority Television Project Inc. v. Federal Communications Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?