Luisa Gonzales, et al v. Texaco, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02820
Filed: April 25, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2010 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 373 WITHDRAWING JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
December 21, 2009 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO IMPOSE ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' UNREASONABLE AND INCOMPETENT ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
November 30, 2009 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT ACTIONS ARE NOT DEEMED RELATED by Judge William Alsup [denying 359 Motion to Relate Case]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
April 25, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 3 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luisa Gonzales, et al v. Texaco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?