Cruz et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02954
Filed: May 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by MDL Panel. Case remanded to Southern District of Texas. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 11, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PFIZER DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE AND SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURT re 7 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/10/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 22, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PFIZER WITH PREJUDICE AND REMANDING COMPLAINT TO TRANSFEROR COURT.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2009: # 1 Order vacating dismissal) (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?