Adams et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03037
Filed: May 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/2/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
February 4, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Charity Cummings terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
November 19, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. William Laut, Charlene Picker, Rita Stewart, Jeannette Tillman, Donald Wilburn, Irene Belker and Mercedes Hughes terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 7, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MACK HOLT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/6/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 10, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/10/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
December 9, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice re (31 in 3:06-cv-03037-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc., Pauline Brookins. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/09/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 1, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer dismissing 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Thomas Erwin). (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?