Isaac-Burgos et al v. Pfizer Corp.

Case Number: 3:2006cv03265
Filed: May 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/5/2010. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
April 26, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (44) Motion in case 3:06-cv-03265-CRB (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
January 4, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/22/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
November 16, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS re 39 Stipulation filed by Pfizer Corp., Motions terminated: 37 MOTION Stay in Proceedings/Extension of Time filed by Nancy Isaac-Burgos, Antonio Rosario-Isaac, 22 First MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Nancy Isaac-Burgos, [. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (staying Pfizer's supplemental response. Update re: status at or before the next scheduled Case Management Conference).. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/29/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 28, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Re: staying deadline).. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 16, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NANCY ISAAC BURGOS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac-Burgos et al v. Pfizer Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?