Kowalski v. Farella Braun & Martel LLP et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03341
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND DISMISSING FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AFTER REMAND. Signed February 4, 2010 by Judge Maxine M. Chesney (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 8, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
August 27, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND NON-TAXABLE COSTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
March 12, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 12, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. If defendants fail to deliver to the Clerk's Office a chambers copy of their opposition to plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs by February 17, 2009, the document will be stricken. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 10, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 13, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 2, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
December 23, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is hereby DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for judgment is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowalski v. Farella Braun & Martel LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?