California Native Plant Society, Defenders of Wildlife et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03604
Filed: June 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 357 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 356 Motion to Vacate CMC and Closing Case.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
June 23, 2016 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 350 Joint MOTION to Continue JUNE 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND JUNE 30 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/22/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 3, 2016 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REMANDED CASE re 348 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
February 10, 2014 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 337 MOTION to Alter Judgment and December 19, 2014 Order filed by California Native Plant Society, Defenders of Wildlife. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/10/2014. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 19, 2013 335 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton Granting 322 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs.(pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
August 23, 2013 328 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF re 327 Stipulation, filed by United States Fish And Wildlife Service, United States Army Corps Of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/23/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
April 8, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE, EXTENT FILING DEADLINE ON FEE APPLICATION AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
October 31, 2012 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 297 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by ARI 208 LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/31/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
December 23, 2011 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 274 Stipulation for Substitution of Parties. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 19, 2011 271 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference (between Plaintiffs and Defendant-Intervenors Arista Del Sol; Sunridge Anatolia; Lennar; and Sunridge Park) set for 1/17/2012 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco, b efore Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Settlement Conference (with counsel for all parties) set for 1/20/2012 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/16/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 17, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE UNTIL JANUARY 17, 2011 AND VACATING NOVEMBER 18, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE re 256 Status Report filed by United States Fish And Wildlife Service, United States Army Corps Of Engineers, United States Environmental Proctection Agency. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
June 1, 2010 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 254 Status Report filed by United States Fish And Wildlife Service, United States Army Corps Of Engineers, United States Environmental Proctection Agency. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
December 1, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/1/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 14, 2008 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 226 Motion to Withdraw. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Native Plant Society, Defenders of Wildlife et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?