O'Brien et al v. General Electric Company et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03724
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 79 granting DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ASBESTOS EXPOSURE CLAIMS OCCURRING ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 FROM DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/2014. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 15, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re refreshments. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 12, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING TRIAL EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/12/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 31, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
June 11, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER grantingre 37 Substitution of Counsel filed by General Dynamics Corporation. Attorney Edward R. Hugo for General Dynamics Corporation added. Attorney Gabriel Anne Jackson and Daniel Dennis O'Shea terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/6/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 STIPULATION filed by David Daniels. David Daniels terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/6/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/8/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
December 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO PLAINTIFF WILFRED JODOIN,, AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Wilfred Jodoin. Wilfred Jodoin terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
September 25, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 4, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 9/28/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 13, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (MDL 875) by MDL Panel remanding case back to the USDC Northern District-San Francisco; Case reopened. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?