Clouthier et al v. County of Contra Costa et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv03893
Filed: June 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to stipulation, the action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 27, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
November 23, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE. NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE; VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to notice of pending settlement, the trial in this matter set for December 6 , 2010 is taken off calendar, as is the November 30, 2010 Pretrial Conference. Parties are to file a Request for Dismissal no later than December 22, 2010. If no dismissal is filed by said date, the parties shall appear at a Case Management Conference on January 21, 2011, and file a joint statement by January 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/23/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 10, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND FILING DATE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
April 5, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/2/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 2, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 26, 2010 to April 2, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than March 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clouthier et al v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?