Jaffe, et al v. Morgan Stanley DW, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv03903
Filed: June 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 298 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Authorizing Claims Administrator to Make Distribution to Class Member Arthur Villanueva re 297 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 2, 2013 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 290 Motion for Leave to File Late Claim. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
October 11, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re. Special Master's October 2, 2012 Report & Recommendation.Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
May 17, 2012 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 5/17/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
August 19, 2010 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 267 Joint motion to rescind opt-outs and permit certain objectors and opt-outs to file claims forms. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
November 4, 2008 252 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Vincent Griffin. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/04/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaffe, et al v. Morgan Stanley DW, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?