Amamgbo v. Sony BMG Music Entertainment et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charles Amamgbo
Defendant: Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Sony Corporation of America, Bertelsmann, Inc., Universal Music Group, Time Warner, Inc., Warner Music Group Corp. and Emi Group, PLC
Case Number: 3:2006cv03927
Filed: June 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2007 4 RECEIPT/ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet & Transferral Order & All Original Case File Documents from United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Case No. C-07-166. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2007 Transfer Out Transmittal LETTER: A Certified Docket Sheet & Transferral Order & All Original Case File Documents Sent Via Certified Mail to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (tn, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2007 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and Assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska for coordinated or consolidated pretrial processing pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407, MDL No. 1780 & Case No. 07-CV-166.***Civil Case Terminated. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
June 23, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 2006 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 9/19/2006 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2006 at 10:00 A.M.. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006)
June 23, 2006 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Time Warner, Inc., Warner Music Group Corp., Emi Group, PLC, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Sony Corporation of America, Bertelsmann, Inc. & Universal Music Group. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 2006 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of the Sherman Act, State Antitrust & Unfair Deceptive Acts & Practice Statutes & for Unjust Enrichment Under State Law - [Summons Issued] against Time Warner, Inc., Warner Music Group Corp., Emi Group, PLC, Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Sony Corporation of America, Bertelsmann, Inc. & Universal Music Group, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 4412886]. Filed by Plaintiff Charles Amamgbo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2006 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amamgbo v. Sony BMG Music Entertainment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Amamgbo
Represented By: Donald Chidi Amamgbo, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony BMG Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertelsmann, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emi Group, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?