Furnace v. Evans et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04229
Filed: July 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
August 3, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/3/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
June 11, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 06/11/2012. (njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 25, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION; GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE DISCOVERY STAY; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 25, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
April 13, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 29, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. The parties will file their Case Management Statement by June 22, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
August 17, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Defendants motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED and judgment shall be entered in favor of each of the defendants. in favor of A. Hedgpeth, D. Vega, E. Medina, G. Ponder, J Celaya, J. Rodriguez, K. Knuckles, M. Nilsson, M. S. Evans, S. McDonald, T. A. Variz against Edward Terran Furnace (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furnace v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?