Meola v. AXA Financial Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04291
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING (145) Motion for Settlement; GRANTING (146) Motion for Attorney Fees, and entering JUDGMENT. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 23, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
August 24, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Correspondence. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 13, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (137 in 3:06-cv-04291-JSW) STIPULATION RE: REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND FOR NEWLY DISCOVERED CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
July 8, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 134 Motion for Extension. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 12, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
April 13, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 18, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING (114) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 9, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 2, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 104 MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 8, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 100 Stipulation Continuing Deadline to Submit Preliminary Settlement Approval Papers. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 1, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 Joint Notice To Court of Settlement and Request to Continue CMC and Set Hearing for Preliminary Approval;. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/1/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meola v. AXA Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?