Reilly v. The Hearst Corporation, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04332
Filed: July 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2006 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying 3 Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2006 (epb, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2006 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 9 Motion to Intervene by The McClatchy Company. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2006 (epb, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2006 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation Regarding Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/24/06. Plaintiff to file and serve motion for temporary restraining order by 12:00 noon, 7/24/06. Defendan ts to file and serve oppos. by 5:00 p.m. Tuesday, 7/25/06. Reply if any to be filed and served by 12:00 noon 7/26/06. Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 2:00 p.m., 7/27/06, Courtroom 10, U.S.D.C. San Francisco.(epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2006 (epb, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly v. The Hearst Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?