Castle et al v. Wells Fargo Financial, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2006cv04347
Filed: July 17, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 27, 2011 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 03:00 PM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
August 31, 2011 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 3, 2011 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUA SPONTE LIFTING STAY; DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT; AND SETTING THIS CASE FOR A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 AT 3:00 PM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
December 22, 2009 316 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Approving Settlement, Dismissing Fifth Cause Of Action With Prejudice, And Granting Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
March 17, 2009 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating case management conference. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/16/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 12, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER VACATING 1/09 CASE MANAGEMENT AND CONTINUING IT TO 3/20/09.The previous order did not have the continuance texted added to the e.filed version.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/29/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
January 29, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management to 3/20/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 26, 2009 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY re 293 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 30, 2008 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 296 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
July 25, 2006 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Richard Castle,, Jonathan Shaver,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/06. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castle et al v. Wells Fargo Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?