Weinstein v. Metlife, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04444
Filed: July 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Extend deadline for mailing of class member settlement payment. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009) Modified on 9/30/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 196 Motion for Settlement; granting 209 Motion for Attorney Fees (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
June 30, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending deadline for Attorneys Fees Motion (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 12, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: extension to notice to class members (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 6, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTING A SETTLEMENT HEARING. re 190 Signed by Judge Illston on 4/6/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 27, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 188 . Extension of notice mailing deadline to 4/3/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 4, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 179 Motion for preliminary approval of settlement (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 16, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REEDER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND DENYING WEINSTEIN PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTION. The Weinstein parties must file their proposed settlement agreement by 1/23/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 13, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR REEDER PLAINTIFFS TO ATTEND JANUARY 16, 2009 HEARING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
December 9, 2008 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: WEINSTEIN PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTACT REEDER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/9/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 26, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 4/10/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/25/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 14, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to amend. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT attached. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/13/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 30, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to certify class continued to 2/6/09 @ 9 a.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
February 4, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing to 7/25/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/1/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Metlife, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?