Faigman et al v. Cingular Wireless, LLC

Case Number: 3:2006cv04622
Filed: July 28, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for final approval of the class settlement is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees, litigation expenses and an incentive award in GRANTED as follows: class counsel is awarded $1,185,803.78 in attorneys' fees, $54,196.22 in litigation costs and $3,333.33 as an incentive award to each of the three class representatives; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/15/201. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
September 1, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS AND GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/01/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
November 20, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 1/25/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/20/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
May 21, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference reset for 6/29/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/20/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
April 22, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER sealing transcript of 4/20/2009 case management conference; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/22/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
December 5, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER adjourning hearing re 101 MOTION to Certify Class filed by David Faigman, Lisa Faigman; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/5/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
September 25, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's request for discovery; Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2008 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/25/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 5, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending page limits for class certification briefing; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/5/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faigman et al v. Cingular Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?