Bargen et al v. United States of America et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv04744
Filed: August 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
May 26, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT & RELEASE re 65 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
January 20, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
May 4, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 41 MOTION for Hearing MOTION to permit action which exceeds total amount of government claim or alternatively for leave to amend his government claim filed by Gerald Von Bargen. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 2, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 48 Order to Show Cause; ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 41 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Stipulation filed by United States of America. DEFENDANT NEED NOT BE PRESENT AT THE APRIL 9, 2009 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/1/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 24, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING RE DKT #41; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/9/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/2/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
January 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS LETTER re 33 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 12, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS LETTER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bargen et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?