Wade v. American Federation of Government Employees
Case Number: 3:2006cv04751
Filed: August 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION; ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Federation of Government Employees. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER RE SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT re 27 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/9/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/8/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/4/2008 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2008.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/3/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. American Federation of Government Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?